EP0556157 - Fungicidal mixtures based on triazole fungicides and 4,6-dimethyl-N-phenyl-2-pyrimidinamine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.1998 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.11.1998 [1998/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | [1997/14] |
Former [1993/33] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hubele, Adolf, Dr. Obere Egg 9 CH-4312 Magden / CH | 02 /
Zeun, Ronald, Dr. Pfarrer-Christen-Strasse 6 W-7844 Neuenburg / DE | [1993/33] | Application number, filing date | 93810071.6 | 04.02.1993 | [1993/33] | Priority number, date | CH19920000427 | 13.02.1992 Original published format: CH 42792 | [1993/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0556157 | Date: | 18.08.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0556157 | Date: | 26.11.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/54, // (A01N43/653, 43:54),(A01N55/00, 43:54) | [1993/33] | CPC: |
A01N43/653 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/653, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N43/653, A01N43/54 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL [1993/33] | Title | German: | Fungizide Mischungen auf der Basis von Triazol-Fungiziden und 4,6-Dimethyl-N-Phenyl-2-Pyrimidinamin | [1993/33] | English: | Fungicidal mixtures based on triazole fungicides and 4,6-dimethyl-N-phenyl-2-pyrimidinamine | [1993/33] | French: | Mélanges fongicides à base de fongicides triazoliques et de 4,6-diméthyl-N-phenyl-2-pyrimidinamine | [1993/33] | Examination procedure | 03.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/14] | 31.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.05.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]DD151404 (FRANKE FRIEDRICH, et al); | [Y]FR2516349 (ICI PLC [GB]); | [A]EP0238943 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [A]DE3715705 (BAYER AG [DE]) |