EP0571324 - Nipper set for a comber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.1996 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG Klosterstrasse 20 8406 Winterthur / CH | [2008/39] |
Former [1993/47] | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG CH-8406 Winterthur / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jörg, Andreas Herrgasse 6 CH-8413 Neftenbach / CH | 02 /
Wuest, Olivier Gladiolenstrasse 29 CH-8472 Seuzach / CH | [1993/47] | Application number, filing date | 93810312.4 | 28.04.1993 | [1993/47] | Priority number, date | CH19920001617 | 20.05.1992 Original published format: CH 161792 | [1993/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0571324 | Date: | 24.11.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0571324 | Date: | 24.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | D01G19/16 | [1993/47] | CPC: |
D01G19/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, IT, LI [1993/47] | Title | German: | Zangenaggregat für eine Kämmaschine | [1993/47] | English: | Nipper set for a comber | [1993/47] | French: | Unité à pince pour une peigneuse | [1993/47] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 12.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/47] | 17.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 24.05.1995 | [1999/42] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP61028022 ; | [A]EP0364779 ; | [AD]US3103041 ; | [A]FR802978 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 178 (C-355)1986 & JP-A-61 028 022 ( TOYODA AUTOM LOOM WORKS LTD ), & JP61028022 A 00000000 |