EP0573394 - Stabilized chlorinated polymer compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.1997 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1998 [1998/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | [1997/11] |
Former [1996/51] | For all designated states Ciba SC Holding AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | ||
Former [1993/49] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaufhold, Johannes Am Buchacker 2 W-6145 Lindenfels / DE | 02 /
Zinke, Horst, Dr. Höhenweg 34 W-6101 Reichelsheim/Odw. / DE | [1993/49] | Application number, filing date | 93810386.8 | 27.05.1993 | [1993/49] | Priority number, date | CH19920001806 | 04.06.1992 Original published format: CH 180692 | [1993/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0573394 | Date: | 08.12.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0573394 | Date: | 15.01.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08L27/06, C08K5/00, // (C08K5/00, 5:57, 5:57, 5:5398) | [1993/49] | CPC: |
C08K5/5398 (EP,US);
C08K5/57 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/5398, C08L57/08 (EP,US);
C08K5/57, C08L57/08 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/49] | Title | German: | Stabilisierte chlorhaltige Polymerzusammensetzungen | [1993/49] | English: | Stabilized chlorinated polymer compositions | [1993/49] | French: | Compositions de polymères chlorées et stabilisées | [1993/49] | Examination procedure | 20.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/29] | 30.01.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 23.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 21.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0337084 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]) |