EP0634694 - Guiding and deflection device for a web of photographic material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.04.1996 [1996/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GRETAG IMAGING AG Althardstrasse 70 8105 Regensdorf / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1995/03] | For all designated states GRETAG IMAGING AG Althardstrasse 70 CH-8105 Regensdorf / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keller, Guido Wehntalerstrasse 580 CH-8046 Zürich / CH | 02 /
Frick, Beat, Dr. Rosengartenstrasse 5 CH-8107 Buchs / CH | 03 /
Wyss, Herbert Bachtobelstrasse, 49 CH-8106 Adlikon / CH | [1995/03] | Representative(s) | Kleewein, Walter, et al Ciba Specialty Chemicals Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1995/03] | Kleewein, Walter, Dr., et al Patentabteilung CIBA-GEIGY AG Postfach CH-4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 93810509.5 | 14.07.1993 | [1995/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0634694 | Date: | 18.01.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G03D13/00, B65H20/32 | [1995/03] | CPC: |
G03D13/003 (EP);
B65H20/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, LI [1995/03] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Führung und Umlenkung von fotografischem Bandmaterial | [1995/03] | English: | Guiding and deflection device for a web of photographic material | [1995/03] | French: | Dispositif de guidage et de renvoi de matériau photographique en bande | [1995/03] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 19.07.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/16] | 23.11.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1996/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 04.09.1995 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1995 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4030462 (AGFA-GEVAERT A.G.) [A] 1 * column 2 - column 3; figure 1 *; | [A]US4903100 (M.KOGANE) [A] 1 * column 3 - column 9; figures 1-10 *; | [A]EP0183982 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO.) [A] 1 * page 6 - page 14; figures 1-3 * |