EP0589827 - Cartridge and bags containing hardenable mortar masses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.06.1998 [1998/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HILTI Aktiengesellschaft 9494 Schaan / LI | [N/P] |
Former [1994/13] | For all designated states HILTI Aktiengesellschaft FL-9494 Schaan / LI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Popp, Franz An der Allee 26 D-86807 Buchloe / DE | 02 /
Huesler, Hans Rietzaunstrasse 4 CH-9472 Grabs / CH | [1994/13] | Representative(s) | Wildi, Roland Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung 9494 Schaan / LI | [N/P] |
Former [1994/13] | Wildi, Roland Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung FL-9494 Schaan / LI | Application number, filing date | 93810522.8 | 21.07.1993 | [1994/13] | Priority number, date | DE19924231421 | 19.09.1992 Original published format: DE 4231421 | [1994/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0589827 | Date: | 30.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0589827 | Date: | 11.06.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/76, B05C17/01 | [1994/13] | CPC: |
B05C17/00583 (EP);
B05C17/00576 (EP);
B05C17/01 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1994/13] | Title | German: | Kassette und aushärtbare Mörtelmassen enthaltende Beutel | [1994/13] | English: | Cartridge and bags containing hardenable mortar masses | [1994/13] | French: | Cassette et sacs contenant des masses de mortier durcissables | [1994/13] | Examination procedure | 22.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/24] | 29.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 17.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0083802 (TEROSON GMBH [DE]); | [AD]DE8901554U ; | [A]EP0319666 (KNIERIEM GUNTHER) |