EP0594540 - Antiretroviral acyl compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.02.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | [1997/20] |
Former [1994/17] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bold, Guido, Dr. Bleumatthöhe 16 CH-5264 Gipf-Oberfrick / CH | 02 /
Fässler, Alexander, Dr. Sonnenblickstrasse 10 CH-3063 Ittigen / CH | 03 /
Lang, Marc, Dr. Rue de Valdoie 24 F-68200 Mulhouse / FR | [1994/17] | Application number, filing date | 93810724.0 | 14.10.1993 | [1994/17] | Priority number, date | CH19920003312 | 23.10.1992 Original published format: CH 331292 | [1994/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0594540 | Date: | 27.04.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0594540 | Date: | 01.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/02, A61K38/55 | [1998/14] | CPC: |
C07K5/021 (EP);
C07D401/12 (KR);
A61K38/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1994/17] | C07K5/02, A61K37/64 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/17] | Title | German: | Antiretrovirale Acyl-Verbindungen | [1994/17] | English: | Antiretroviral acyl compounds | [1994/17] | French: | Composés acylés actifs contre les rétrovirus | [1994/17] | Examination procedure | 09.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/45] | 18.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.08.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 01.04.1998 | FR | 01.04.1998 | GB | 01.04.1998 | GR | 01.04.1998 | IT | 01.04.1998 | NL | 01.04.1998 | DK | 01.07.1998 | PT | 01.07.1998 | SE | 01.07.1998 | AT | 14.10.1998 | LU | 14.10.1998 | IE | 23.10.1998 | BE | 31.10.1998 | CH | 31.10.1998 | LI | 31.10.1998 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/38] | ES | 01.04.1998 | |
GB | 01.04.1998 | ||
GR | 01.04.1998 | ||
IT | 01.04.1998 | ||
NL | 01.04.1998 | ||
DK | 01.07.1998 | ||
PT | 01.07.1998 | ||
SE | 01.07.1998 | ||
FR | 28.08.1998 | ||
AT | 14.10.1998 | ||
LU | 14.10.1998 | ||
IE | 23.10.1998 | ||
BE | 31.10.1998 | ||
CH | 31.10.1998 | ||
LI | 31.10.1998 | ||
Former [2003/45] | ES | 01.04.1998 | |
GB | 01.04.1998 | ||
GR | 01.04.1998 | ||
IT | 01.04.1998 | ||
NL | 01.04.1998 | ||
DK | 01.07.1998 | ||
PT | 01.07.1998 | ||
SE | 01.07.1998 | ||
FR | 28.08.1998 | ||
AT | 14.10.1998 | ||
IE | 23.10.1998 | ||
BE | 31.10.1998 | ||
CH | 31.10.1998 | ||
LI | 31.10.1998 | ||
LU | 31.10.1998 | ||
Former [2003/08] | ES | 01.04.1998 | |
GB | 01.04.1998 | ||
GR | 01.04.1998 | ||
IT | 01.04.1998 | ||
NL | 01.04.1998 | ||
PT | 01.07.1998 | ||
SE | 01.07.1998 | ||
FR | 28.08.1998 | ||
AT | 14.10.1998 | ||
IE | 23.10.1998 | ||
BE | 31.10.1998 | ||
CH | 31.10.1998 | ||
LI | 31.10.1998 | ||
LU | 31.10.1998 | ||
Former [2002/26] | ES | 01.04.1998 | |
GB | 01.04.1998 | ||
GR | 01.04.1998 | ||
IT | 01.04.1998 | ||
PT | 01.07.1998 | ||
SE | 01.07.1998 | ||
FR | 28.08.1998 | ||
AT | 14.10.1998 | ||
IE | 23.10.1998 | ||
BE | 31.10.1998 | ||
CH | 31.10.1998 | ||
LI | 31.10.1998 | ||
LU | 31.10.1998 | ||
Former [2002/10] | GB | 01.04.1998 | |
GR | 01.04.1998 | ||
IT | 01.04.1998 | ||
PT | 01.07.1998 | ||
SE | 01.07.1998 | ||
FR | 28.08.1998 | ||
AT | 14.10.1998 | ||
IE | 23.10.1998 | ||
BE | 31.10.1998 | ||
CH | 31.10.1998 | ||
LI | 31.10.1998 | ||
LU | 31.10.1998 | ||
Former [2000/52] | GB | 01.04.1998 | |
GR | 01.04.1998 | ||
IE | 01.04.1998 | ||
IT | 01.04.1998 | ||
PT | 01.07.1998 | ||
SE | 01.07.1998 | ||
FR | 28.08.1998 | ||
AT | 14.10.1998 | ||
BE | 31.10.1998 | ||
CH | 31.10.1998 | ||
LI | 31.10.1998 | ||
LU | 31.10.1998 | ||
Former [2000/24] | GB | 01.04.1998 | |
GR | 01.04.1998 | ||
IE | 01.04.1998 | ||
IT | 01.04.1998 | ||
PT | 01.07.1998 | ||
SE | 01.07.1998 | ||
FR | 28.08.1998 | ||
AT | 14.10.1998 | ||
BE | 31.10.1998 | ||
LU | 31.10.1998 | ||
Former [2000/23] | GB | 01.04.1998 | |
GR | 01.04.1998 | ||
IE | 01.04.1998 | ||
IT | 01.04.1998 | ||
PT | 01.07.1998 | ||
SE | 01.07.1998 | ||
FR | 28.08.1998 | ||
BE | 31.10.1998 | ||
LU | 31.10.1998 | ||
Former [2000/05] | GB | 01.04.1998 | |
GR | 01.04.1998 | ||
IE | 01.04.1998 | ||
IT | 01.04.1998 | ||
PT | 01.07.1998 | ||
SE | 01.07.1998 | ||
FR | 28.08.1998 | ||
LU | 31.10.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | GB | 01.04.1998 | |
IE | 01.04.1998 | ||
IT | 01.04.1998 | ||
PT | 01.07.1998 | ||
SE | 01.07.1998 | ||
FR | 28.08.1998 | ||
Former [1999/32] | GB | 01.04.1998 | |
IE | 01.04.1998 | ||
PT | 01.07.1998 | ||
SE | 01.07.1998 | ||
FR | 28.08.1998 | ||
Former [1999/16] | GB | 01.04.1998 | |
IE | 01.04.1998 | ||
SE | 01.07.1998 | ||
FR | 28.08.1998 | ||
Former [1999/02] | GB | 01.04.1998 | |
SE | 01.07.1998 | ||
FR | 28.08.1998 | ||
Former [1998/52] | SE | 01.07.1998 | |
FR | 28.08.1998 | ||
Former [1998/44] | SE | 01.07.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0432695 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [AD] 1-23* the whole document * |