EP0597805 - Pipe clamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.04.1997 [1997/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HILTI Aktiengesellschaft 9494 Schaan / LI | [N/P] |
Former [1994/20] | For all designated states HILTI Aktiengesellschaft FL-9494 Schaan / LI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hense, Urlich Römerauterrasse 18 D-86899 Landsberg / DE | 02 /
Hoefle, Siegfried VBG. Wirtschaftspark A-6840 Götzis / AT | [1994/20] | Representative(s) | Wildi, Roland Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung 9494 Schaan / LI | [N/P] |
Former [1994/20] | Wildi, Roland Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung FL-9494 Schaan / LI | Application number, filing date | 93810753.9 | 28.10.1993 | [1994/20] | Priority number, date | DE19924237674 | 07.11.1992 Original published format: DE 4237674 | [1994/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0597805 | Date: | 18.05.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0597805 | Date: | 24.04.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F16L33/04, F16L3/14 | [1994/20] | CPC: |
F16L3/1008 (EP);
F16L3/14 (EP);
F16L33/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/20] | Title | German: | Rohrschelle | [1994/20] | English: | Pipe clamp | [1994/20] | French: | Collier de serrage pour tuyau | [1996/17] |
Former [1994/20] | Collier de serrage | Examination procedure | 03.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/31] | 21.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 24.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 30.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2457403 (COTTINET JEAN) [A] 1 * page 3, lines 4-5; figure 3 *; | [A]EP0225516 (MUELLER FRANZ) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]DE9205682U (SIKLA GMBH & CO KG) [A] 1 * figure 1 * |