EP0658996 - Method and apparatus to secure the information of a data packet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Metering AG Feldstrasse 1 6300 Zug / CH | [2000/19] |
Former [2000/12] | For all designated states Landis & Gyr Technology Innovation AG 6301 Zug / CH | ||
Former [1995/25] | For all designated states Landis & Gyr Technology Innovation AG CH-6301 Zug / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schaub, Thomas Moosstrasse 16 CH-6330 Cham / CH | [1995/25] | Application number, filing date | 93810875.0 | 14.12.1993 | [1995/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0658996 | Date: | 21.06.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0658996 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/06 | [1995/25] | CPC: |
H04L9/0637 (EP);
H04L2209/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zum Sichern der Information eines Datenpaketes | [1995/25] | English: | Method and apparatus to secure the information of a data packet | [1995/25] | French: | Procédé et appareil de sécurisation d'information d'un paquet de données | [1995/25] | Examination procedure | 21.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/38] | 25.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 22.03.2000 | GB | 22.03.2000 | GR | 22.03.2000 | PT | 23.06.2000 | AT | 14.12.2000 | LU | 14.12.2000 | [2005/23] |
Former [2004/07] | ES | 22.03.2000 | |
GB | 22.03.2000 | ||
GR | 22.03.2000 | ||
PT | 23.06.2000 | ||
AT | 14.12.2000 | ||
Former [2003/09] | ES | 22.03.2000 | |
GB | 22.03.2000 | ||
PT | 23.06.2000 | ||
AT | 14.12.2000 | ||
Former [2002/26] | ES | 22.03.2000 | |
GB | 22.03.2000 | ||
PT | 23.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/50] | GB | 22.03.2000 | |
IE | 22.03.2000 | ||
PT | 23.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/12] | GB | 22.03.2000 | |
PT | 23.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/09] | PT | 23.06.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0422757 (FISCHER ADDISON M [US]) [A] 4* abstract * | [A] - DIFFIE & HELLMAN, "Exhaustive Cryptoanalysis of the NBS Data Encryption Standard", COMPUTER, LONG BEACH US, (197706), vol. 10, no. 6, pages 74 - 84 [A] 1,2,6 * page 80, column L, line 9 - page 81, column L, line 35; figures 1,A,B * | [A] - MASSEY ET AL, "A Self-Synchronizing Digital Scrambler for Cryptographic Protection of Data", 1984 INTERNATIONAL ZÜRICH SEMINAR ON DIGITAL COMMUNICATIONS, NY,USA, (198403), pages 163 - 169 [A] 1,2,6 * page 165, column L, line 18 - line 36; figures 2.2,2.3 * |