EP0574359 - Street-lamp with fog lighting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.1996 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.12.1996 [1996/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carolfi, Gianni Via Settenevepalo, Km 6,400 I-00069 Trevignano Romano (RM) / IT | [1993/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/50] | Representative(s) | Banchetti, Marina, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte 26 00187 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/50] | Banchetti, Marina, et al c/o Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte, 26 I-00187 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 93830106.6 | 17.03.1993 | [1993/50] | Priority number, date | IT1992RM00133U | 12.06.1992 Original published format: IT RM920133 U | [1993/50] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0574359 | Date: | 15.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0574359 | Date: | 03.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F21S1/10 | [1993/50] | CPC: |
F21S8/086 (EP,US);
F21W2131/103 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/50] | Title | German: | Strassenleuchte mit Nebelbeleuchtungsvorrichtung | [1993/50] | English: | Street-lamp with fog lighting device | [1993/50] | French: | Candélabre avec dispositif d'éclairage anti brouillard | [1993/50] | Examination procedure | 30.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/31] | 18.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1216689 (REALISATIONS URBAINES ET RURAL); | [A]DE3437821 (JANHSEN JAKOBUS) |