EP0620639 - Variable gain amplifier for low supply voltage systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/42] | Variable gain amplifier for low supply voltage | ||
[1998/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.1999 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Srl Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/35] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | ||
Former [1994/42] | For all designated states SGS-THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 I-20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Betti, Giorgio Viale Premuda, 24 I-20129 Milano / IT | 02 /
Moloney, David Via Brera, 24 I-20010 Cornaredo / IT | 03 /
Portaluri, Salvatore Via C. Pavesi, 4 I-27100 Pavia / IT | [1994/42] | Representative(s) | Pellegri, Alberto, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Via Carducci, 8 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/42] | Pellegri, Alberto, et al c/o Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Via Puccini, 7 I-21100 Varese / IT | Application number, filing date | 93830147.0 | 06.04.1993 | [1994/42] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0620639 | Date: | 19.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0620639 | Date: | 10.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H03G1/00, H03G1/04 | [1994/42] | CPC: |
H03G1/04 (EP,US);
H03G1/0023 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/42] | Title | German: | Veränderliche Verstärkungsregelung für Anordnungen mit niedriger Speisespannung | [1998/18] | English: | Variable gain amplifier for low supply voltage systems | [1998/18] | French: | Amplificateur à gain variable pour systèmes à tension d'alimentation basse | [1998/18] |
Former [1994/42] | Veränderliche Verstärkungsregelung bei niedriger Speisespannung | ||
Former [1994/42] | Variable gain amplifier for low supply voltage | ||
Former [1994/42] | Amplificateur à gain variable en cas de tension d'alimentation basse | Examination procedure | 18.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/22] | 25.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.11.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP03033989 | [A] - IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS vol. 24, no. 4, August 1989, NEW YORK US pages 951 - 961 TZU-WANG PAN E.A. 'a 50-dB variable gain amplifier using parasitic bipolar transistors in CMOS.' | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 169 (P-1196)26 April 1991 & JP-A-03 033 989 ( NEC CORP. ) 14 February 1991, & JP03033989 A 19910214 |