EP0571337 - Process to purify proteins from cell systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.04.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 11.02.2004 [2004/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WABCO B.V. Industrieweg 4, P.O. Box 1074 7940 KB Meppel / NL | [1997/51] |
Former [1996/52] | For all designated states SORIN BIOMEDICA DIAGNOSTICS S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 14 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1993/47] | For all designated states SORIN BIOMEDICA S.p.A. Via Crescentino I-13040 Saluggia (Vercelli) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bonelli, Fabrizio Via Musso 2 I-15033 Casale Monferrato, Alessandria / IT | 02 /
Cecconato, Elvi Via Platis 24 I-10034 Chivasso, Torino / IT | 03 /
Calogero, Raffaele Via Felice Pirozzi, 15 I-80038 Pomigliano d'Arco, Napoli / IT | [1993/47] | Representative(s) | de Simone, Domenico, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte 26 00187 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/47] | de Simone, Domenico, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte 26 I-00187 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 93830191.8 | 03.05.1993 | [1993/47] | Priority number, date | IT1992RM00385 | 22.05.1992 Original published format: IT RM920385 | [1993/47] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0571337 | Date: | 24.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0571337 | Date: | 06.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0571337 | Date: | 30.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07K1/20, C07K1/30, C07K1/36 | [1999/26] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP);
C07K1/20 (EP);
C07K1/36 (EP);
C12N2770/24222 (EP);
C12N2770/24264 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/14] | C07K1/00 | ||
Former IPC [1993/47] | C07K3/02, C07K3/12, // C07K3/20, C07K3/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/47] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Reinigung von Proteinen aus Zellsystemen | [1993/47] | English: | Process to purify proteins from cell systems | [1993/47] | French: | Procédé de purification de protéins à partir de systèmes cellulaires | [1993/47] | Examination procedure | 07.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/01] | 18.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 30.06.1999 | DK | 30.09.1999 | PT | 30.09.1999 | [2004/07] |
Former [2003/45] | DK | 30.09.1999 | |
PT | 30.09.1999 | ||
Former [2000/25] | PT | 30.09.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH01300898 ; | [A]EP0480048 (SHISEIDO CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1* page 10, line 21 - page 11, line 9 * | [A] - M.P. DEUTSCHER (ED.), "Guide to protein purification", METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, INC. NEW YORK, US;, (1990), vol. 182, no. 1, pages 285 - 300 [A] 1 * Precipitation techniques, by S. ENGLAND AND S. SEIFTER; page 296, line 14 - page 298, line 16 * | [A] - "Purification of Physiologically Active Protein", DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 90, no. 03, Database accession no. 90-020000, & JPH01300898 A 19891205 (AJINIMOTO KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | [DA] - A. MITRAKI AND J. KING, "Protein folding intermediates and inclusion body formation", BIO/TECHNOLOGY, NATURE AMERICA, INC., NEW YORK, US;, (198907), vol. 7, no. 7, pages 690 - 697 [DA] 1 * the whole document * | [DA] - P.C. BABBITT ET AL., "Removal of a proteolytic activity associated with aggregates formed from expression of creatine kinase in Escherichia coli leads to improved recovery of active enzyme", BIO/TECHNOLOGY, NATURE AMERICA, INC., NEW YORK, US;, (199010), vol. 8, no. 10, pages 945 - 949 [DA] 1 * the whole document * |