EP0591123 - Oil seal for sealing off a rotating shaft relative to a housing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/14] | Oil seal for a fast rotating shaft | ||
[1998/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.2000 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.01.2001 [2001/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ATLAS COPCO TOOLS AB, NACKA P.O. Box 90111 120 21 Stockholm / SE | [2000/03] |
Former [1994/14] | For all designated states ATLAS COPCO TOOLS AB, NACKA P.O. Box 90111 S-120 21 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Johansson Edling, Jan Krister Isbergavägen 44 S-125 32 Alvsjö / SE | 02 /
Jacobsson, Rolf Alexis Hemvägen 7A S-132 35 Saltsjö-Boo / SE | [1994/14] | Representative(s) | Pantzar, Tord Atlas Copco Tools AB Patent Department 105 23 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/14] | Pantzar, Tord Atlas Copco Tools AB Patent Department S-105 23 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 93850186.3 | 01.10.1993 | [1994/14] | Priority number, date | SE19920002849 | 01.10.1992 Original published format: SE 9202849 | [1994/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0591123 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0591123 | Date: | 19.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0591123 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/34 | [1994/14] | CPC: |
F16J15/3416 (EP,US);
F16C33/76 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/14] | Title | German: | Öldichtung zum Abdichten einer rotierenden Welle gegenüber einem Gehäuse | [1998/50] | English: | Oil seal for sealing off a rotating shaft relative to a housing | [1998/50] | French: | Joint à huile pour étanchéifier un arbre tournant par rapport à un corps | [1998/50] |
Former [1994/14] | Öldichtung für schnell rotierende Welle | ||
Former [1994/14] | Oil seal for a fast rotating shaft | ||
Former [1994/14] | Joint à huile pour arbre tournant à grande vitesse | Examination procedure | 09.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/49] | 17.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS59219577 ; | [A]DE283575 (NORMA) [A] 1* page 1, line 45 - line 53; figure 1 *; | [A]DE1006677 (COUNTY COMMERCIAL CARS LTD) [A] 1 * column 3, line 42 - line 45; figure 1 *; | [A]DE1650061 (KLEIN SCHANZLIN & BECKER AG) [A] 1 * column 4, paragraph 1; figure 1 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850424), vol. 9, no. 94, Database accession no. (M - 374)<1817>, & JP59219577 A 19841210 (ARAI SEISAKUSHO) [X] 1,3,4 * abstract * |