EP0607769 - Packaging assembly with improved stackability [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.04.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.1997 | Refusal of application | published on 21.05.1997 [1997/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/30] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tack, Joris Gustaaf Jozef E. Opdebeecklaan 5 B-3140 Keerbergen / BE | 02 /
Verhelle, Christian Daniel Bergstraat 2 B-2800 Mechelen / BE | [1994/30] | Representative(s) | Canonici, Jean-Jacques, et al NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/30] | Canonici, Jean-Jacques, et al Procter & Gamble European Technical Center N.V. Temselaan 100 B-1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 93870007.7 | 20.01.1993 | [1994/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0607769 | Date: | 27.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B65D71/38, B65D21/02, B65D81/20, B65D5/06, B65B31/04 | [1994/30] | CPC: |
B65B31/04 (EP);
B65D21/0209 (EP);
B65D5/067 (EP);
B65D71/38 (EP);
B65D81/2061 (EP);
B65D2571/00037 (EP);
B65D2571/00141 (EP);
B65D2571/00148 (EP);
B65D2571/00666 (EP);
B65D2571/0079 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1994/30] | Title | German: | Verpackungsanordnung mit verbesserter Stapelbarkeit | [1994/30] | English: | Packaging assembly with improved stackability | [1994/30] | French: | Emballage permettant un empilement amélioré | [1994/30] | Examination procedure | 11.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/10] | 13.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1997/21] | 02.01.1997 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1997/21] | Request for further processing for: | 21.02.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 21.02.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.03.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1560631 ; | [Y]GB2124597 ; | [Y]DE4037018 ; | [Y]US3817018 ; | [A]US4793490 |