EP0628625 - Protease compatible with lipase in dry, concentrated bleach compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2000 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 21.06.2000 [2000/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Trani, Marina Via Gualtiero Serafino 20 I-00136 Roma / IT | 02 /
Ricci, Carlo Via Dante de Blasi 70 I-00151 Roma / IT | [1994/50] | Representative(s) | Canonici, Jean-Jacques, et al NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | Canonici, Jean-Jacques, et al Procter & Gamble European Technical Center N.V. Temselaan 100 B-1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 93870099.4 | 07.06.1993 | [1994/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0628625 | Date: | 14.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0628625 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/386, C11D3/39 | [1994/50] | CPC: |
C11D3/38627 (EP);
C11D3/38672 (EP);
C11D3/3942 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, PT [1998/52] |
Former [1994/50] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Mit Lipase verträgliche Protease in trockenen konzentrierten Bleichmitteln | [1994/50] | English: | Protease compatible with lipase in dry, concentrated bleach compositions | [1994/50] | French: | Protéase compatible avec lipase dans les compositions solides de blanchiment | [1994/50] | Examination procedure | 02.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/31] | 14.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.11.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 06.05.1999 | PT | 06.08.1999 | [2000/25] |
Former [2000/23] | BE | 06.05.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | JPH02208400 [ ] (LION CORP); | [A]WO9109941 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [A] 1,5 * page 4 - page 6; example - *; | [A]EP0415652 (CLOROX CO [US]) [A] 1,3,4 * page 4; example - *; | [A]EP0206390 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 5; example - *; | [DA]WO8707292 (NOVO INDUSTRI AS [DK]) [DA] 1,5 * page 4, line 1 - line 10; example 2; claim - * | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19910128), vol. 114, no. 4, Database accession no. 26217, page 118 [A] 1-3 * abstract * | Examination | US4106991 |