EP0608677 - Refuse receptacle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.1997 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KARL EDER ROBUST-PLASTIK KUNSTSTOFFVERARBEITUNGS-GESELLSCHAFT m.b.H Hosnedlgasse 18 A-1220 Wien / AT | [1994/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | 02 /
* * * | [1994/31] | Representative(s) | Berger, Erhard Siebensterngasse 39 Postfach 306 1071 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/31] | Berger, Erhard, Dr. Siebensterngasse 39 Postfach 306 A-1071 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 93890135.2 | 07.07.1993 | [1994/31] | Priority number, date | AT19930000146 | 28.01.1993 Original published format: AT 14693 | [1994/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0608677 | Date: | 03.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0608677 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B65F1/14, B65F1/02 | [1994/31] | CPC: |
B65F1/02 (EP);
B65F1/14 (EP);
B65F2210/183 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/31] | Title | German: | Mülltonne | [1994/31] | English: | Refuse receptacle | [1994/31] | French: | Poubelle | [1994/31] | Examination procedure | 17.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/03] | 29.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 12.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 16.10.1996 | ES | 16.10.1996 | GB | 16.10.1996 | GR | 16.10.1996 | PT | 16.01.1997 | SE | 16.01.1997 | IE | 27.06.1997 | AT | 07.07.1997 | [2002/26] |
Former [2002/10] | DK | 16.10.1996 | |
GB | 16.10.1996 | ||
GR | 16.10.1996 | ||
PT | 16.01.1997 | ||
SE | 16.01.1997 | ||
IE | 27.06.1997 | ||
AT | 07.07.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | DK | 16.10.1996 | |
GB | 16.10.1996 | ||
GR | 16.10.1996 | ||
IE | 16.10.1996 | ||
PT | 16.01.1997 | ||
SE | 16.01.1997 | ||
AT | 07.07.1997 | ||
Former [1999/16] | DK | 16.10.1996 | |
GB | 16.10.1996 | ||
IE | 16.10.1996 | ||
PT | 16.01.1997 | ||
SE | 16.01.1997 | ||
AT | 07.07.1997 | ||
Former [1999/01] | DK | 16.10.1996 | |
GB | 16.10.1996 | ||
PT | 16.01.1997 | ||
SE | 16.01.1997 | ||
AT | 07.07.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | DK | 16.10.1996 | |
GB | 16.10.1996 | ||
PT | 16.01.1997 | ||
SE | 16.01.1997 | ||
Former [1997/50] | GB | 16.10.1996 | |
PT | 16.01.1997 | ||
SE | 16.01.1997 | ||
Former [1997/39] | GB | 16.10.1996 | |
SE | 16.01.1997 | ||
Former [1997/30] | GB | 16.10.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE9115757U (PONTECH GESELLSCHAFT FÜR TECHNOLOGISCHE ENTWICKLUNGEN MBH); | [A]WO9212914 (EDELHOFF POLYTECHNIK [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE9209248U (EDELHOFF M.S.T.S. GMBH) |