EP0592383 - Manually controlled turning machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RSF-Elektronik Gesellschaft m.b.H. A-5121 Tarsdorf 93 / AT | [1994/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rieder, Heinz Maria Bühelstrasse 23 A-5110 Oberndorf / AT | [1994/15] | Representative(s) | Hübscher, Heiner, et al Spittelwiese 7 4020 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/15] | Hübscher, Heiner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Spittelwiese 7 A-4020 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 93890170.9 | 03.09.1993 | [1994/15] | Priority number, date | AT19920001805 | 10.09.1992 Original published format: AT 180592 | [1994/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0592383 | Date: | 13.04.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0592383 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q1/25, B23Q17/22 | [1997/20] | CPC: |
B23Q17/22 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1994/15] | B23Q1/14, B23Q17/22 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1994/15] | Title | German: | Manuell gesteuerte Drehmaschine | [1994/15] | English: | Manually controlled turning machine | [1994/15] | French: | Tour à commande manuelle | [1994/15] | Examination procedure | 30.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/35] | 23.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 14.05.1997 | GB | 14.05.1997 | IT | 14.05.1997 | NL | 14.05.1997 | SE | 14.08.1997 | LU | 03.09.1997 | BE | 30.09.1997 | CH | 30.09.1997 | LI | 30.09.1997 | [2008/05] |
Former [2007/04] | FR | 14.05.1997 | |
GB | 14.05.1997 | ||
IT | 14.05.1997 | ||
NL | 14.05.1997 | ||
SE | 14.08.1997 | ||
LU | 03.09.1997 | ||
BE | 30.09.1997 | ||
CH | 30.09.1997 | ||
LI | 30.09.1997 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FR | 14.05.1997 | |
GB | 14.05.1997 | ||
IT | 14.05.1997 | ||
NL | 14.05.1997 | ||
SE | 14.08.1997 | ||
LU | 03.09.1997 | ||
CH | 30.09.1997 | ||
LI | 30.09.1997 | ||
Former [2004/38] | GB | 14.05.1997 | |
IT | 14.05.1997 | ||
NL | 14.05.1997 | ||
SE | 14.08.1997 | ||
LU | 03.09.1997 | ||
BE | 30.09.1997 | ||
CH | 30.09.1997 | ||
LI | 30.09.1997 | ||
FR | 10.10.1997 | ||
Former [2003/08] | GB | 14.05.1997 | |
IT | 14.05.1997 | ||
NL | 14.05.1997 | ||
SE | 14.08.1997 | ||
BE | 30.09.1997 | ||
CH | 30.09.1997 | ||
LI | 30.09.1997 | ||
LU | 30.09.1997 | ||
FR | 10.10.1997 | ||
Former [2000/07] | GB | 14.05.1997 | |
IT | 14.05.1997 | ||
SE | 14.08.1997 | ||
BE | 30.09.1997 | ||
CH | 30.09.1997 | ||
LI | 30.09.1997 | ||
LU | 30.09.1997 | ||
FR | 10.10.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | GB | 14.05.1997 | |
IT | 14.05.1997 | ||
SE | 14.08.1997 | ||
BE | 30.09.1997 | ||
CH | 30.09.1997 | ||
LI | 30.09.1997 | ||
FR | 10.10.1997 | ||
Former [1998/46] | GB | 14.05.1997 | |
SE | 14.08.1997 | ||
BE | 30.09.1997 | ||
CH | 30.09.1997 | ||
LI | 30.09.1997 | ||
FR | 10.10.1997 | ||
Former [1998/45] | GB | 14.05.1997 | |
SE | 14.08.1997 | ||
CH | 30.09.1997 | ||
LI | 30.09.1997 | ||
FR | 10.10.1997 | ||
Former [1998/19] | BE | 14.05.1997 | |
GB | 14.05.1997 | ||
SE | 14.08.1997 | ||
FR | 10.10.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | BE | 14.05.1997 | |
GB | 14.05.1997 | ||
SE | 14.08.1997 | ||
Former [1998/12] | BE | 14.05.1997 | |
SE | 14.08.1997 | ||
Former [1998/10] | BE | 14.05.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3905288 (RENZ) [Y] 1-3 * column 4, line 40 - line 41; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2926345 (ROEGER) [A] 1-3 * column W *; | [A]EP0192787 (PAJAKANTA OY) [A] 1-3 * page 4, line 10 - page 5, line 22; figure 1 *; | [A]DE3722871 (JAUCH) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]DE2365373 (ARNOLD ET AL) [A] 1 * figures 2,3 *; | [A]CH376347 (MEYRAT & LUISONI) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]DD49749 (LIEBETRAU ET AL) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0064741 (MAHO WERKZEUGMASCHINENBAU BABEL & CO.) | [Y] - E.PACINI, "Why digital readouts", TOOLING AND PRODUCTION, SOLON US, (197506), vol. 41, no. 3, pages 39 - 41 [Y] 1-3 * page 40, column R, paragraph 4 - paragraph 5 * |