EP0599803 - Process for detecting antibodies and antigens [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanochemia Pharmazeutika AG Boltzmannsgasse 11 1090 Wien / AT | [1999/33] |
Former [1999/27] | For all designated states Sanochemia Pharmazeutica Aktiengesellschaft Boltzmannsgasse 11 1090 Wien / AT | ||
Former [1994/22] | For all designated states Waldheim Pharmazeutika Gesellschaft m.b.H. Landeggerstrasse 7 A-2491 Neufeld/Leitha (Burgenland) / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schinkinger, Manfred, Dr. Rudgergasse 9 A-2700 Wiener Neustadt / AT | 02 /
Korger, Markus, Dr. Karmelitergasse 7 A-1020 Wien / AT | [1994/22] | Representative(s) | Beer, Manfred, et al BEER & PARTNER PATENTANWÄLTE KG Lindengasse 8 1070 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/22] | Beer, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing., et al Lindengasse 8 A-1070 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 93890224.4 | 15.11.1993 | [1994/22] | Priority number, date | AT19920002321 | 23.11.1992 Original published format: AT 232192 | AT19930000065 | 18.01.1993 Original published format: AT 6593 | [1994/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0599803 | Date: | 01.06.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0599803 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543, G01N33/566, G01N33/58, G01N33/553 | [1999/02] | CPC: |
G01N33/54313 (EP);
G01N33/569 (EP);
G01N33/6857 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1994/22] | G01N33/566, G01N33/58, G01N33/553 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1994/22] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Nachweisen von Antikörpern und Antigenen | [1994/22] | English: | Process for detecting antibodies and antigens | [1994/22] | French: | Procédé de décèlement d'anticorps et d'antigènes | [1994/22] | Examination procedure | 24.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/34] | 20.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 06.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12] | Request for further processing for: | 06.11.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 06.11.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.12.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1996 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.05.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 05.04.2000 | SE | 05.04.2000 | AT | 15.11.2000 | DK | 15.11.2000 | GB | 15.11.2000 | ES | 16.11.2000 | BE | 30.11.2000 | CH | 30.11.2000 | LI | 30.11.2000 | [2004/28] |
Former [2003/45] | FR | 05.04.2000 | |
SE | 05.04.2000 | ||
AT | 15.11.2000 | ||
DK | 15.11.2000 | ||
GB | 15.11.2000 | ||
BE | 30.11.2000 | ||
CH | 30.11.2000 | ||
LI | 30.11.2000 | ||
Former [2002/32] | FR | 05.04.2000 | |
SE | 05.04.2000 | ||
AT | 15.11.2000 | ||
GB | 15.11.2000 | ||
BE | 30.11.2000 | ||
CH | 30.11.2000 | ||
LI | 30.11.2000 | ||
Former [2002/29] | SE | 05.04.2000 | |
AT | 15.11.2000 | ||
GB | 15.11.2000 | ||
BE | 30.11.2000 | ||
CH | 30.11.2000 | ||
LI | 30.11.2000 | ||
Former [2002/15] | AT | 15.11.2000 | |
GB | 15.11.2000 | ||
BE | 30.11.2000 | ||
CH | 30.11.2000 | ||
LI | 30.11.2000 | ||
Former [2002/13] | GB | 15.11.2000 | |
BE | 30.11.2000 | ||
CH | 30.11.2000 | ||
LI | 30.11.2000 | ||
Former [2002/12] | GB | 15.11.2000 | |
BE | 30.11.2000 | ||
Former [2002/03] | BE | 30.11.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0317001 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE]) [Y] 2,6-8,18,31-35,39; | [DY]WO8906801 (HOLMES MICHAEL JOHN [GB], et al) [DY] 2,6-8,18,31-35,39; | [A]WO8906543 (GENELABS INC [US])[A] 2,6-8,18,31-35,39 |