EP0615491 - A TARPAULIN PROVIDED WITH A DECORATION OF A REFLECTING MATERIAL AND A METHOD OF MAKING IT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2000 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 31.01.2001 [2001/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OPPENHEJM, Ulrich Lojeltegaard, Lojeltevej 16-18 2970 Horsholm / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1994/38] | For all designated states OPPENHEJM, Ulrich Lojeltegaard, Lojeltevej 16-18 DK-2970 Horsholm / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/38] | Representative(s) | Nyeng, Joergen, et al Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1994/38] | Nyeng, Joergen, et al c/o Hofman-Bang & Boutard A/S Adelgade 15 DK-1304 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 93900019.6 | 04.12.1992 | [1994/38] | WO1992DK00367 | Priority number, date | DK19910001956 | 04.12.1991 Original published format: DK 195691 | [1994/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9310985 | Date: | 10.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0615491 | Date: | 21.09.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0615491 | Date: | 20.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 10.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B44F1/02, D06N7/04 | [1994/38] | CPC: |
D06N3/0063 (EP);
B44F1/02 (EP);
B60J7/104 (EP);
D06N3/183 (EP);
D06Q1/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/38] | Title | German: | MIT REFLEKTIERENDEM MATERIAL VERSEHENE PLANE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | [1994/38] | English: | A TARPAULIN PROVIDED WITH A DECORATION OF A REFLECTING MATERIAL AND A METHOD OF MAKING IT | [1994/38] | French: | BACHE DECOREE D'UN MATERIAU REFLECHISSANT ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [1994/38] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.1994 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/38] | 04.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 10.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 15.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | PT | 20.06.1996 | IE | 04.12.1996 | [2001/05] |
Former [1998/14] | PT | 20.06.1996 | Cited in | International search | [A]SE365163 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG); | [PA]GB2255313 (SWINTEX [GB]) |