EP0572609 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR MELTING SCRAP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.1998 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOEST-ALPINE Industrieanlagenbau GmbH Turmstrasse 44 4020 Linz / AT | For all designated states Daimler-Benz Aktiengesellschaft Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/35] | For all designated states VOEST-ALPINE Industrieanlagenbau GmbH Turmstrasse 44 A-4020 Linz / AT | ||
For all designated states DAIMLER-BENZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | |||
Former [1995/18] | For all designated states VOEST-ALPINE Industrieanlagenbau GmbH Turmstrasse 44 A-4020 Linz / AT | ||
For all designated states MERCEDES-BENZ AG Mercedesstrasse 136 D-70327 Stuttgart / DE | |||
Former [1993/49] | For all designated states AUSTRIAN INDUSTRIES AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Kantgasse 1 A-1015 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VON BOGDANDY, Ludwig Jungmairstrasse 8 A-4020 Linz / AT | 02 /
FISCHER, Jens-Uwe Friedrichsthaler Weg 19 D-1000 Berlin 28 / DE | 03 /
NIEDER, Wolfgang Schrötterweg 12 A-4040 Linz / AT | 04 /
WINKLER, Manfred Taubenweg 20 A-4501 Neuhofen / AT | [1993/49] | Representative(s) | Haffner, Thomas M. Haffner und Keschmann Patentanwälte KG Schottengasse 3a 1014 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/49] | Haffner, Thomas M., Dr. Patentanwalt Schottengasse 3a A-1014 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 93900117.8 | 21.12.1992 | [1993/49] | WO1992AT00171 | Priority number, date | AT19910002547 | 20.12.1991 Original published format: AT 254791 | [1993/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9313228 | Date: | 08.07.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0572609 | Date: | 08.12.1993 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0572609 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C21C5/52, F27D3/00, F27B3/18, C21C5/56, F27D17/00 | [1993/49] | CPC: |
C21C5/5217 (EP);
C21C5/527 (EP);
C21C5/565 (EP);
F27B3/186 (EP);
F27B3/22 (EP);
F27D17/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/49] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM EINSCHMELZEN VON SCHROTT, SOWIE VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DIESES VERFAHRENS | [1993/49] | English: | PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR MELTING SCRAP | [1993/49] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE FONTE DE FERRAILLE | [1993/49] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.1993 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/49] | 03.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 12.03.1997 | ES | 12.03.1997 | GR | 12.03.1997 | NL | 12.03.1997 | PT | 12.06.1997 | SE | 12.06.1997 | [2003/08] |
Former [2002/26] | DK | 12.03.1997 | |
ES | 12.03.1997 | ||
GR | 12.03.1997 | ||
PT | 12.06.1997 | ||
SE | 12.06.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | DK | 12.03.1997 | |
GR | 12.03.1997 | ||
PT | 12.06.1997 | ||
SE | 12.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | DK | 12.03.1997 | |
PT | 12.06.1997 | ||
SE | 12.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/11] | PT | 12.06.1997 | |
SE | 12.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/03] | PT | 12.06.1997 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR1553354 ; | [A]DE2830720 (INST METALLURG IM 50 LETIJA SS); | [A]EP0373378 (FUCHS SYSTEMTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) |