EP0571600 - SLAB FORMWORK PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.10.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.1995 [1995/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOFRAMAT Z.I. de l'Alabanne F-73490 La Ravoire / FR | [1993/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOUVIGNET, Edmond Chemin Blanche-Pierre F-73420 Drumettaz-Clarafond / FR | [1993/48] | Representative(s) | Derambure, Christian, et al BREESE DERAMBURE MAJEROWICZ 38, avenue de l'Opéra 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/48] | Derambure, Christian, et al Cabinet Bouju Derambure (Bugnion) S.A., 52, rue de Monceau F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 93900226.7 | 05.11.1992 | [1993/48] | WO1992FR01031 | Priority number, date | FR19910014042 | 07.11.1991 Original published format: FR 9114042 | [1993/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9309312 | Date: | 13.05.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0571600 | Date: | 01.12.1993 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.05.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | E04G9/05, E04G1/15, E04G11/48, E04C2/20 | [1993/48] | CPC: |
E04G1/153 (EP);
E04G9/05 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1993/48] | Title | German: | BODEN-SCHALUNGSPANEEL | [1993/48] | English: | SLAB FORMWORK PANEL | [1993/48] | French: | PANNEAU DE COFFRAGE DE DALLE | [1993/48] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.1993 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/48] | 01.06.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/48] | 29.06.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1995/48] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1994 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO8705353 ; | [A]US3592435 ; | [A]DE3601290 ; | [A]FR1500597 ; | [A]EP0451617 ; | [A]WO8909691 ; | [A]US4680214 ; | [A]US4163824 ; | [A]EP0018187 ; | [A]FR2136813 ; | [A]FR2501267 ; | [A]WO9001602 ; | [A]LU66654 |