EP0675752 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING SEPARATE CONTAINERS OF BIOLOGICAL FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/41] | SYSTEM FOR PROCESSING SEPARATE CONTAINERS OF BIOLOGICAL FLUID | ||
[1998/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PALL CORPORATION 2200 Northern Blvd. East Hills, New York 11548 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/41] | For all designated states Pall Corporation 2200 Northern Blvd. East Hills, New York 11548 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATKOVICH, Vlado, I. 11 Old Estate Road Glen Cove, NY 11542 / US | 02 /
BORMANN, Thomas, J. 29 Cawfield Lane Melville, NY 11747 / US | 03 /
GSELL, Thomas, C. 40 Valentine Avenue Glen Cove, NY 11542 / US | 04 /
PASCALE, Frank, R. 12 Francis Court Glen Cove, NY 11542 / US | [1995/41] | Representative(s) | Knott, Stephen Gilbert Mathisen & Macara LLP Communications House South Street Staines-upon-Thames Middlesex, TW18 4PR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/41] | Knott, Stephen Gilbert MATHISEN, MACARA & CO. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road Ickenham Uxbridge Middlesex UB10 8BZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 93900579.9 | 20.11.1992 | [1995/41] | WO1992US10034 | Priority number, date | US19910795480 | 21.11.1991 Original published format: US 795480 | [1995/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9309863 | Date: | 27.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0675752 | Date: | 11.10.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0675752 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.05.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B01D35/01, B01D37/00, A61M1/02 | [1995/41] | CPC: |
A61M1/0209 (EP,US);
A61M1/0218 (EP,US);
A61M1/0231 (EP,US);
A61M1/3646 (EP,US);
A61M1/3652 (EP,US);
A61M2202/0439 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61M2202/0439, A61M2202/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1995/41] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON GESONDERTEN BEHÄLTERN MIT BIOLOGISCHEM FLUIDUM | [1998/04] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING SEPARATE CONTAINERS OF BIOLOGICAL FLUID | [1998/04] | French: | SYSTEME ET METHODE POUR LA COMBINAISON DE RECIPIENTS SEPARES CONTENANT UN FLUIDE BIOLOGIQUE | [1998/04] |
Former [1995/41] | SYSTEM ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON GESONDERTEN BEHÄLTERN MIT BIOLOGISCHEM FLUIDUM | ||
Former [1995/41] | SYSTEM FOR PROCESSING SEPARATE CONTAINERS OF BIOLOGICAL FLUID | ||
Former [1995/41] | SYSTEME POUR LA COMBINAISON DE RECIPIENTS SEPARES CONTENANT UN FLUIDE BIOLOGIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.1994 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.1994 | Search fee paid | 17.05.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 17.05.1994 | Examination requested [1995/41] | 03.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 09.05.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 21.01.1998 | IT | 21.01.1998 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 21.01.1998 | |
FR | 19.06.1998 | ||
Former [1998/44] | FR | 19.06.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR2368967 (TERUMO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,6,7,11,16,17,26 * page 6, line 16 - page 8, line 30; figure - * [Y] 2-4,8-10,12-15,18-25,27; | [A]US4191183 (MENDELSON BARRY [US]); | [XY]US4334535 (WILSON DAVID A, et al) [X] 1,17 * column A; figure - * * column 5, line 54 - column 6 * * column 6, line 55 - column 7, line 4 * [Y] 2-4,8-10,12-15,18-25,27; | [A]US4900322 (ADAMS JAMES D [US]) | International search | [Y]US4360435 (BELLAMY DAVID, et al); | [Y]US4701267 (WATANABE HIROYUKI [JP], et al); | [Y]US4985153 (KURODA TORU [JP], et al); | [A]US5056568 (DIGIANFILIPPO ALEANDRO [US], et al); | [YP]US5074839 (CHOKSI PRADIP V [US], et al); | [YP]US5126054 (MATKOVICH VLADO [US]) | Examination | EP0455215 |