EP0672006 - WIND PROPELLED CRAFT WITH MULTI-FUNCTION RUDDER CONTROL ARM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.1999 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.10.1999 [1999/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAGUEREZ, Georges Y. 2477 Overlook Road Cleveland Heights, OH 44106 / US | For all designated states MAGUEREZ, Charles P. Laberwrach F-29214 Lamnilis / FR | [1995/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/38] | Representative(s) | Price, Paul Anthony King, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/12] | Price, Paul Anthony King, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | ||
Former [1995/38] | Cook, Anthony John, et al D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 93900745.6 | 01.12.1992 | [1995/38] | WO1992US10342 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9412389 | Date: | 09.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0672006 | Date: | 20.09.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0672006 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.06.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B63H25/06, B63H25/10 | [1996/04] | CPC: |
B63H25/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/38] | B63H25/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1995/38] | Title | German: | WINDGETRIEBENES FAHRZEUG MIT MULTIFUNKTIONELLEM RUDDERARM | [1995/38] | English: | WIND PROPELLED CRAFT WITH MULTI-FUNCTION RUDDER CONTROL ARM | [1995/38] | French: | EMBARCATION PROPULSEE PAR LE VENT AVEC LEVIER DE COMMANDE DE GOUVERNAIL MULTIFONCTIONNEL | [1995/38] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.1995 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.1995 | Search fee paid | 01.06.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed | 01.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/38] | 03.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 24.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4852507 (RYON RANDALL C [US], et al) [X] 1-3,18,19 * column W * | International search | [XY]US4054100 (RINEMAN RICHARD LYNN); | [XY]US4679516 (FRIESEN TERRY V [US]); | [Y]US4553496 (FORESMAN ROBERT [US]); | [A]US3985090 (RINEMAN RICHARD LYNN); | [A]US4563967 (OKSMAN G TIMOTHY [US]) |