EP0580826 - SEALED ELECTRONIC PACKAGE PROVIDING IN-SITU METALLIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.1996 [1996/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [1994/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KNECHT, Thomas, A. 6410 Coachlight Crystal Lake, IL 60012 / US | 02 /
MANCINI, Brian, M. 855 Seneca Carol Stream, IL 60188 / US | 03 /
KRAUSE, Joseph, P. 1495 Castlewood Drive Wheaton, IL 60187 / US | [1994/05] | Representative(s) | Hudson, Peter David, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link, Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/32] | Hudson, Peter David, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | ||
Former [1994/05] | Hudson, Peter David Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 1PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 93900797.7 | 27.11.1992 | [1994/05] | WO1992US10366 | Priority number, date | US19920836643 | 14.02.1992 Original published format: US 836643 | [1994/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9316577 | Date: | 19.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0580826 | Date: | 02.02.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.08.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H05K5/06, H01L41/04 | [1994/05] | CPC: |
H03H9/0504 (EP,US);
H03H3/02 (EP,US);
H03H9/1014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/05] | Title | German: | ABGEDICHTETE ELEKTRONIK-PACKUNG ZUR IN-SITU METALLISIERUNG | [1994/05] | English: | SEALED ELECTRONIC PACKAGE PROVIDING IN-SITU METALLIZATION | [1994/05] | French: | EMBALLAGE HERMETIQUEMENT FERME DE COMPOSANT ELECTRONIQUE PERMETTANT LA METALLISATION IN SITU. | [1994/05] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.1993 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.1993 | Search fee paid | 01.10.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.1993 | Examination requested [1994/05] | 23.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/26] | 01.02.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1995 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPS58170210 ; | [XAY]US2816239 (BERGE ROBERT E); | [Y]US4454639 (DWORSKY LAWRENCE N [US], et al) | International search | [X]US3006711 (SILVER JOHN F); | [Y]US4391034 (STUBY KENNETH P); | [Y]US4410407 (MACAULAY ALEXANDER [US]); | [A]US4849079 (CUOMO JEROME J [US], et al) |