EP0616578 - HYBRID INFLATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 09.07.1997 [1997/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BENDIX-ATLANTIC INFLATOR COMPANY c/o Allied-Signal Inc., 101 Columbia Road, P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | [1994/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANTOM, Richard, Louis 67799 South Forest Richmond, MI 48062 / US | 02 /
BISHOP, Robert, John 13554 Lillian Lane Sterling Heights, MI 48313 / US | 03 /
KREMER, Robert, Max 17490 Sewel Fraser, MI 48026 / US | 04 /
OCKER, Klaus, Friedrich 16273 Pine Ridge North Fraser, MI 48026 / US | 05 /
WOODS, Charles, David 4186 Stepney Drive Gainesville, VA 22065 / US | 06 /
RENFROE, Donald, Wadsworth 4258 Bear Hollow Trail Haymarket, VA 22069 / US | 07 /
ROSE, James, Michael 4225 Majestic Lane Fairfax, VA 22033 / US | 08 /
BAZEL, Teresa, Lorraine 14482 Black Horse Court Centreville, VA 22020 / US | 09 /
BROWN, Roy, Glenn 2105 Marion Anderson Road Hot Springs, AR 71913 / US | [1994/39] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/25] | W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | ||
Former [1994/39] | Turner, Alan Reginald Bendix HVCG Europe Limited, Douglas Road Kingswood, Bristol BS15 2NL / GB | Application number, filing date | 93901410.6 | 09.12.1992 | [1994/39] | WO1992US10570 | Priority number, date | US19910808781 | 17.12.1991 Original published format: US 808781 | [1994/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9311973 | Date: | 24.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0616578 | Date: | 28.09.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0616578 | Date: | 14.02.1996 | [1996/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/26, F42B3/04 | [1994/39] | CPC: |
B60R21/272 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1994/39] | Title | German: | HYBRIDE AUFBLASVORRICHTUNG | [1994/39] | English: | HYBRID INFLATOR | [1994/39] | French: | GONFLEUR HYBRIDE | [1994/39] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.1994 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/39] | 16.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 01.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 14.02.1996 | CH | 14.02.1996 | LI | 14.02.1996 | [1997/28] |
Former [1996/52] | BE | 14.02.1996 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2171107 (OLIN CORP [US]); | [A]US3877721 (BROWN JR ROBERT K); | [A]US3910596 (WULBRECHT ROBERT M, et al); | [A]US5031932 (FRANTOM RICHARD L [US], et al); | [AP]US5076607 (WOODS CHARLES D [US], et al) |