EP0623623 - 2-AMINOETHANESULFONIC ACID/ZINC COMPLEX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.03.2001 [2001/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZAIDAN HOJIN SEISAN KAIHATSU KAGAKU KENKYUSHO 15, Morimoto-cho Shimogamo Sakyo-ku Kyotoshi Kyoto 606 / JP | [1994/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJIMURA, Hajime 9-2, Shimomiyanomae-cho Shishigatani Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 606 / JP | 02 /
YABUUCHI, Takahiro 11-15, Isoshi 3-chome Takarazuka Hyogo 665 / JP | 03 /
TANAKA, Teruo Shiju 2-401 13, Morimoto-cho Ogurisu Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-13 / JP | 04 /
NAGAMURA, Yoichi Toyoake Manshon 501 18-4, Yoshiike Nitta-cho Toyoake Aichi 470-11 / JP | [1994/45] | Representative(s) | Burford, Anthony Frederick Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/45] | Burford, Anthony Frederick W.H. Beck, Greener & Co. 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 93901527.7 | 13.01.1993 | [1994/45] | WO1993JP00057 | Priority number, date | JP19920024642 | 14.01.1992 Original published format: JP 2464292 | [1994/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9314095 | Date: | 22.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0623623 | Date: | 09.11.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0623623 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.07.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07F3/06, A61K31/315 | [1994/45] | CPC: |
A61K31/315 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
C07F3/003 (EP,US);
C07F3/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/45] | Title | German: | KOMPLEX VON 2-AMINOÄTHANSULFONSÄURE UND ZINK | [1999/08] | English: | 2-AMINOETHANESULFONIC ACID/ZINC COMPLEX | [1994/45] | French: | COMPLEXE D'ACIDE 2-AMINOETHANESULFONIQUE/ZINC | [1994/45] |
Former [1994/45] | KOMPLEX VON 2-AMINÄTHANSULFONSÄURE UND ZINK | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.1994 | Translation filed | 11.07.1994 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.1994 | Search fee paid | 11.07.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 11.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/45] | 16.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 74, No. 14, Abstract No. 71065p (LODHI, SAEED A. K. et al.), "Spectrophotometric studies of copper (II) and chromium (III) ions with taurine", Pak. J. Sci. Ind. Res., 1970, 13 (3), 202-5. | Examination | EP0206692 |