EP0576683 - METHOD FOR EDITING FIGURE, AND SYSTEM THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2001 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.09.2001 [2001/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOKYO GAS CO., LTD. 5-20, Kaigan 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0022 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/37] | For all designated states TOKYO GAS CO., LTD. 5-20, Kaigan 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-0022 / JP | ||
Former [1994/01] | For all designated states TOKYO GAS CO., LTD. 5-20, Kaigan 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATO, Hiroto 304 Ikebukuro Apart 48-6, Higashiikebukuro 1-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo 170 / JP | 02 /
SHINOAKI, Sakura 6-3, Kataseyama 3-chome Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251 / JP | 03 /
TANAKA, Kyozo 206 Jujo Garden House 28-15, Jujonakahara 1-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 114 / JP | [1994/01] | Representative(s) | Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patent PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Patenta Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/18] | Blumbach, Kramer & Partner Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 D-81245 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/01] | Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 D-81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93901566.5 | 08.01.1993 | [1994/01] | WO1993JP00015 | Priority number, date | JP19920022106 | 10.01.1992 Original published format: JP 2210692 | [1994/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9314466 | Date: | 22.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0576683 | Date: | 05.01.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0576683 | Date: | 13.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.07.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G06T11/00, G06T11/60 | [2000/10] | CPC: |
G06T11/60 (EP,US);
G06T11/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/51] | G06F15/62, G06F15/72 | ||
Former IPC [1994/01] | G06F15/62 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM EDITIEREN VON BILDERN UND DAFÜR GEEIGNETES SYSTEM | [1994/04] | English: | METHOD FOR EDITING FIGURE, AND SYSTEM THEREFOR | [1994/01] | French: | PROCEDE DE MODIFICATION D'IMAGES ET SYSTEME RELATIF | [1994/01] |
Former [1994/01] | VERFAHREN ZUM EDITIEREN VON BILDERN UND DAFUR GEEIGNETES SYSTEM | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.1993 | Translation filed | 07.09.1993 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.1993 | Search fee paid | 07.09.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.1993 | Examination requested [1994/01] | 24.01.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.03.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8605610 (ALPHAREL INC [US]) [A] 1-7 * page 11, line 13 - line 25 ** page 23, line 15 - line 32 * | International search | [A]JPS6345629 (JAPAN RADIO CO LTD); | [A]JPS63186374 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JPH02252068 (FUJITSU LTD) |