EP0624091 - PROSTACYCLIN AND CARBACYCLIN DERIVATIVES AS AGENTS IN THE TREATMENT OF MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.1998 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.03.1998 [1998/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schering Aktiengesellschaft Müllerstrasse 170/178 13353 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/46] | For all designated states SCHERING AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Müllerstrasse 170/178 D-13353 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLITSTEIN-WILLINGER, Eveline, Dr. Olivaer Platz 16 D-10707 Berlin / DE | [1994/46] | Application number, filing date | 93901628.3 | 09.01.1993 | [1994/46] | WO1993DE00013 | Priority number, date | DE19924202665 | 28.01.1992 Original published format: DE 4202665 | [1994/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9314761 | Date: | 05.08.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0624091 | Date: | 17.11.1994 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/557 | [1994/46] | CPC: |
A61K31/557 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/46] | Title | German: | PROSTACYCLIN- UND CARBACYCLINDERIVATE ALS MITTEL ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON MULTIPLER SKLEROSE | [1994/46] | English: | PROSTACYCLIN AND CARBACYCLIN DERIVATIVES AS AGENTS IN THE TREATMENT OF MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS | [1994/46] | French: | DERIVES DE PROSTACYCLINE ET DE CARBACYCLINE UTILISES COMME AGENTS POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA SCLEROSE MULTIPLE | [1994/46] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.1994 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/46] | 18.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.12.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 27.01.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1998/12] | Request for further processing for: | 09.01.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 09.01.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.01.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y] - N. ENG. J. MED. Bd. 325, Nr. 7, 1991, Seiten 467 - 472; MOHAMMAD K. SHARIEF ET AL.: 'Association between tumor necrosis factor-alpha and disease progression in patients with multiple sclerosis' in der Anmeldung erwähnt | [Y] - J. NEUROL. Bd. 237, Nr. SUP1, 1990, Seite 83; V. BARNABA ET AL.: 'Increased synthesis of tumor necrosis factor by cerebrospinal fluid-derived T-cell clones from patients with multiple sclerosis' | [Y] - INFECTION AND IMMUNITY Bd. 59, Nr. 10, 1991, Seiten 3846 - 3848; K. SLIWA ET AL.: 'Prevention of murine cerebral malaria by a stable prostacyclin analog' | [A] - LANCET Bd. 2, Nr. 8192, 1980, Seiten 453 - 454; J.D.T.KIRBY ET AL.: 'Prostacyclin increases cyclic-nucleotide responsiveness of lymphocytes from patients with systemic sclerosis' |