EP0580827 - DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE OUTPUT TORQUE OF AN AUTOMATIC GEARBOX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.05.1997 [1997/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1994/05] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BULLMER, Wolfgang Rathaustrasse 27 D-7120 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | 02 /
STREIB, Martin Hohenzollernstrasse 13 D-7143 Vaihingen/Enz 6 / DE | 03 /
SCHOETTLE, Richard Nelkenweg 1 D-7130 Muehlacker / DE | 04 /
ZHANG, Hong Wilheim-Leibl-Strasse 7 D-7120 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [1994/05] | Application number, filing date | 93901640.8 | 15.01.1993 | [1994/05] | WO1993DE00027 | Priority number, date | DE19924204401 | 14.02.1992 Original published format: DE 4204401 | [1994/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9316303 | Date: | 19.08.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0580827 | Date: | 02.02.1994 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0580827 | Date: | 15.05.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/04, B60K41/10, F16H3/00 | [1994/05] | CPC: |
B60W10/04 (EP,US);
B60W10/113 (EP,US);
B60W30/19 (EP,US);
F16H3/006 (EP,US);
F16H61/0437 (EP,US);
B60W2510/105 (EP,US);
B60W2520/10 (EP,US);
B60W2710/0666 (EP,US);
B60W2710/0672 (EP,US);
F16H2059/148 (EP,US);
F16H2306/44 (EP,US);
F16H2306/52 (EP,US);
F16H61/688 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, SE [1994/05] | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG DES ABTRIEBSMOMENTS EINES AUTOMATISCHEN SCHALTGETRIEBES | [1994/05] | English: | DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE OUTPUT TORQUE OF AN AUTOMATIC GEARBOX | [1994/05] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE REGLAGE DU COUPLE DE SORTIE D'UNE BOITE DE VITESSES AUTOMATIQUE | [1994/05] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.1993 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.1993 | Examination requested [1994/05] | 02.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 07.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4724723 (LOCKHART BRUCE D [US], et al); | [Y]DE3140259 (KUGELFISCHER G SCHAEFER & CO [DE]); | [A]DE2938268 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]EP0411558 (FENDT & CO XAVER [DE]); | [A]US5046176 (LIN WILLIAM C [US]) |