EP0631585 - PROTEIN PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.1999 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOVO NORDISK A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1998/40] | For all designated states NOVO NORDISK A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | ||
Former [1995/01] | For all designated states NOVO NORDISK A/S Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOERGENSEN, Per, Linaa Dronningens Tvaergade 37, 1 DK-1302 Copenhagen K / DK | 02 /
PEDERSEN, Poul, Erik Marienborg Allé 33 DK-Soeborg / DK | 03 /
PETERSEN, Joergen Femvej 3 DK-3450 Alleroed / DK | 04 /
NIELSEN, Torben, K. Tingggaardsvaenget 90 DK-4000 Roskilde / DK | 05 /
MIKKELSEN, Jan, Moeller Garderhoejvej 8 DK-2820 Gentofte / DK | [1995/01] | Representative(s) | Jensen, Bo Hammer, et al c/o Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | Jensen, Bo Hammer, et al c/o Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | Application number, filing date | 93901661.4 | 11.12.1992 | [1995/01] | WO1992DK00374 | Priority number, date | WO1991DK00394 | 16.12.1991 Original published format: PCT/DK91/00394 | [1995/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9313125 | Date: | 08.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0631585 | Date: | 04.01.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0631585 | Date: | 30.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 08.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07K1/00, C07K1/30, C07K1/14, C07K1/107 | [1998/40] | CPC: |
C12N9/00 (EP,US);
C07K1/30 (EP,US);
C12N9/54 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/01] | C07K3/00, C07K3/24, C07K3/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1995/01] | Title | German: | PROTEINHERSTELLUNG | [1995/01] | English: | PROTEIN PRODUCTION | [1995/01] | French: | PRODUCTION DE PROTEINES | [1995/01] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.1994 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.06.1994 | Examination requested [1995/01] | 30.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.09.1998 | BE | 30.09.1998 | CH | 30.09.1998 | GR | 30.09.1998 | LI | 30.09.1998 | IE | 11.12.1998 | LU | 11.12.1998 | PT | 30.12.1998 | DK | 31.12.1998 | SE | 31.12.1998 | [2004/38] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 30.09.1998 | |
BE | 30.09.1998 | ||
CH | 30.09.1998 | ||
GR | 30.09.1998 | ||
LI | 30.09.1998 | ||
IE | 11.12.1998 | ||
PT | 30.12.1998 | ||
DK | 31.12.1998 | ||
LU | 31.12.1998 | ||
SE | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 30.09.1998 | |
BE | 30.09.1998 | ||
CH | 30.09.1998 | ||
GR | 30.09.1998 | ||
LI | 30.09.1998 | ||
IE | 11.12.1998 | ||
PT | 30.12.1998 | ||
LU | 31.12.1998 | ||
SE | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 30.09.1998 | |
BE | 30.09.1998 | ||
CH | 30.09.1998 | ||
LI | 30.09.1998 | ||
IE | 11.12.1998 | ||
PT | 30.12.1998 | ||
LU | 31.12.1998 | ||
SE | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 30.09.1998 | |
BE | 30.09.1998 | ||
IE | 11.12.1998 | ||
PT | 30.12.1998 | ||
LU | 31.12.1998 | ||
SE | 31.12.1998 | ||
CH | 04.01.1999 | ||
LI | 04.01.1999 | ||
Former [2000/27] | AT | 30.09.1998 | |
BE | 30.09.1998 | ||
IE | 11.12.1998 | ||
PT | 30.12.1998 | ||
LU | 31.12.1998 | ||
SE | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [2000/07] | AT | 30.09.1998 | |
BE | 30.09.1998 | ||
PT | 30.12.1998 | ||
LU | 31.12.1998 | ||
SE | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/34] | AT | 30.09.1998 | |
BE | 30.09.1998 | ||
PT | 30.12.1998 | ||
SE | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/32] | BE | 30.09.1998 | |
PT | 30.12.1998 | ||
SE | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/29] | BE | 30.09.1998 | |
PT | 30.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/27] | BE | 30.09.1998 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO8704187 (GENETICS INST [US]); | [X]WO9002175 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]); | [A]WO9015864 (GENENCOR INT [US]) | [A] - Dialog Information Services, file 5, BIOSIS, Dialog Accession No. 90098299, IBRAHIM A.N. et al.: "Precipitation and Purification of Amylase Enzyme Produced by Streptomyces-Aureofaciens 77", Arch Pharmacal Res (Seoul) 13 (1), 1990, 28-32. |