EP0614332 - MACHINE FOR PRUNING STANDING TREES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.10.1997 [1997/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PESENTI, Bernard Pellier-Charcier F-39130 Clairvaux-les-Lacs / FR | For all designated states MOREL, Armand La Frasnée F-39130 Clairvaux-les-Lacs / FR | [1994/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/37] | Representative(s) | Lemoyne, Didier, et al Cabinet Ballot-Schmit 5 Avenue Elisée Cusenier 25000 Besancon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/37] | Lemoyne, Didier, et al Cabinet Ballot-Schmit 5, Avenue Elisée Cusenier F-25000 Besancon / FR | Application number, filing date | 93901798.4 | 27.11.1992 | [1994/37] | WO1992FR01110 | Priority number, date | FR19910014866 | 27.11.1991 Original published format: FR 9114866 | FR19920008279 | 30.06.1992 Original published format: FR 9208279 | [1994/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9310658 | Date: | 10.06.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0614332 | Date: | 14.09.1994 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0614332 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A01G23/095, A63B27/00 | [1994/37] | CPC: |
A01G23/0955 (EP);
A63B27/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, LI, SE [1994/37] | Title | German: | BAUMENTASTUNGSMASCHINE FÜR STEHENDE BÄUME | [1994/37] | English: | MACHINE FOR PRUNING STANDING TREES | [1994/37] | French: | MACHINE POUR FACONNER UN ARBRE SUR PIED | [1996/42] |
Former [1994/37] | MACHINE POUR FA ONNER UN ARBRE SUR PIED | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.1994 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/37] | 02.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/41] | Request for further processing for: | 05.08.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 10.07.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.08.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR1469748 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG); | [A]US3356113 (DEL PERUGIA ANDRE); | [X]CH470948 (HEID HANS [CH]); | [Y]EP0118895 (HORI RENJI); | [X]DE3535825 (KAISEI KOGYO KK [JP]) |