EP0643557 - CARBONYL SULPHIDE FUMIGANT AND METHOD OF FUMIGATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.11.1997 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.12.1997 [1997/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION Limestone Avenue Campbell, ACT 2612 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [1995/12] | For all designated states COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION Limestone Avenue Campbell, Australian Capital Territory 2601 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BANKS, Henry, Jonathan 10 Beltana Road Pialligo, ACT 2609 / AU | 02 /
DESMARCHELIER, Francis, James, Michael 55 Cameron Road Queanbeyan, NSW 2620 / AU | 03 /
REN, Yonglin, Burean of Grain Storage and Transp. Division of Insect Control, 45 Fuxingmennei Street Beijing 100801 / CN | [1995/12] | Representative(s) | Marshall, Monica Anne J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/12] | Marshall, Monica Anne J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 93901970.9 | 15.01.1993 | [1995/12] | WO1993AU00018 | Priority number, date | AU19920000426 | 15.01.1992 Original published format: AU 42692 | [1995/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9313659 | Date: | 22.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0643557 | Date: | 22.03.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0643557 | Date: | 02.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 22.07.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A01N31/02, A01N59/04 | [1995/12] | CPC: |
C06D7/00 (EP,KR,US);
A01M17/008 (EP,KR,US);
A01N59/04 (EP,KR,US);
A23B7/144 (EP,KR,US);
A23B7/152 (EP,US);
A23B9/18 (EP,KR,US);
A23B9/22 (EP,US);
A23L3/3445 (EP,KR,US);
B27K3/0271 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/12] | Title | German: | CARBONYLSULFID-BEGASUNGSMITTEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEGASUNG | [1995/12] | English: | CARBONYL SULPHIDE FUMIGANT AND METHOD OF FUMIGATION | [1995/12] | French: | SULFURE DE CARBONYLE EN TANT QU'AGENT DE FUMIGATION ET PROCEDE DE FUMIGATION | [1995/12] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.1994 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.1994 | Search fee paid | 15.07.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 15.07.1994 | Examination requested [1995/12] | 05.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 12.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - G.E.TAYLOR ET AL., "Phytotoxicity in bush bean of five sulfur-containing gases released from advanced fossil energy technologies", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19840716), vol. 101, no. 3, Database accession no. 18617 [X] 1-4 * abstract * | [ ] - J. ENVIRON. QUAL., (1984), vol. 13, no. 2, pages 224 - 230 | [X] - K.A.BROWN ET AL., "Metabolism of [35S]-carbonyl sulfide in perennial ryegrass (Lolium perenne L.) and radish (Raphanus sativus L.)", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19870105), vol. 106, no. 1, Database accession no. 2949 [X] 1-4 * abstract * | [ ] - ENVIRON. EXP. BOT., (1986), vol. 26, no. 4, pages 355 - 364 | [A] - R.FUERST ET AL., "Gases affecting bacterial survival", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19671009), vol. 67, no. 15, Database accession no. 71297w, page 6700, column 2 [A] 1-9 * abstract * | [ ] - DEVELOP. IND. MICROBIOL., (1966), vol. 8, pages 305 - 312 | [A] - W.PERKOW, Die Insektizide, HEIDELBERG, DE, HüTHIG, (1968) [A] 1-9 * pages 467-487: 'Mittel des Vorratsschutzes und der Raumbegasung' * * page 473, paragraph 5 - page 475, paragraph 4 * | International search | [A]AU2674488 (DEUTSCHE GES SCHAEDLINGSBEK); | [A]AU6006290 (LINDE AG) | [A] - FERM, R.J. (1957) The Chemistry of Carbonyl Sulfide, Chemical Reviews, Volume 57, pages 621-6440, see page 627, paragraph 2 in particular. |