EP0577798 - BRUSH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.09.1995 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.1995 [1995/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PILLER, Helmut Clara-Hätzler-Strasse 5 86161 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/02] | For all designated states PILLER, Helmut Clara-Hätzler-Strasse 5 D-86161 Augsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/02] | Representative(s) | Munk, Ludwig Patentanwälte Munk Prinzregentenstrasse 3 86150 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/02] | Munk, Ludwig, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Prinzregentenstrasse 1 D-86150 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 93902056.6 | 28.01.1993 | [1994/02] | WO1993DE00067 | Priority number, date | DE19924202312 | 29.01.1992 Original published format: DE 4202312 | [1994/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9314671 | Date: | 05.08.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0577798 | Date: | 12.01.1994 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A46B7/02 | [1994/02] | CPC: |
A46B7/02 (EP);
A46B2200/1066 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1994/02] | Title | German: | BÜRSTE | [1994/02] | English: | BRUSH | [1994/02] | French: | BROSSE | [1994/02] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.1993 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/02] | 20.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/44] | 02.06.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/44] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1995 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0454625 ; | [Y]DE8705474U ; | [Y]US2254365 ; | [A]DE283892 ; | [A]US2111880 |