EP0581920 - ELECTRIC HAND PLANE WITH PLANING DEPTH ADJUSTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.12.1996 [1996/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1994/06] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WÜNSCH, Steffen Panoramastr. 43A D-7038 Holzgerlingen / DE | 02 /
HILD, Eugen Sulzweg 22 D-7441 Aichtal / DE | 03 /
BRAUNBACH, Karl-Heinz Asternweg 2 D-7022 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | 04 /
FLÖTTMANN, Kai-Uwe Narzissenweg 28 D-4830 Gütersloh / DE | [1994/06] | Application number, filing date | 93902087.1 | 10.02.1993 | [1994/06] | WO1993DE00110 | Priority number, date | DE19924204775 | 18.02.1992 Original published format: DE 4204775 | [1994/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9315885 | Date: | 19.08.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0581920 | Date: | 09.02.1994 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0581920 | Date: | 03.01.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B27C1/10 | [1994/06] | CPC: |
B27C1/10 (EP,US);
Y10T409/306384 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1994/06] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHER HANDHOBEL MIT HOBELTIEFENEINSTELLVORRICHTUNG | [1994/06] | English: | ELECTRIC HAND PLANE WITH PLANING DEPTH ADJUSTER | [1994/06] | French: | RABOT ELECTRIQUE A MAIN COMPORTANT UN DISPOSITIF DE REGLAGE DE LA PROFONDEUR DE RABOTAGE | [1994/06] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.1993 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.1993 | Examination requested [1994/06] | 03.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR563376 ; | [X]CH263087 (MUELLER MAX [CH]); | [A]US2600279 (SPITZLEY HENRY A); | [X]DE1024232 (MEY KG MASCHF MAFELL); | [X]FR1520140 (SCHEER & CIE C F); | [Y]US3407857 (GORDON BENTLEY JOHN); | [Y]FR2150152 (REICH MASCHF GMBH KARL); | [Y]US4555850 (FRECH ALFRED [DE]); | [X]DE3441943 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]); | [X]US4693648 (CAVEDO ROBERT P [US]) |