EP0571619 - DEVICES FOR STRAIGHTENING, CLAMPING, COMPRESSING AND STRETCHING THE SPINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/48] | IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO PROCESSES AND DEVICES FOR STRAIGHTENING, CLAMPING, COMPRESSING AND STRETCHING THE SPINE | ||
[1997/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IE | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AESCULAP-JBS SA Zone Industrielle Savipol A 328 - Sainte Savine - 10300 Ste Savine / FR | [1997/21] |
Former [1993/48] | For all designated states JBS, Société Anonyme 4, rue Villa Beausoleil, BP 3048 F-10000 Troyes / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEANSON, Jean-François 4, rue Villa-Beausoleil F-10000 Troyes / FR | 02 /
MARNAY, Thierry 16, montée du Carmel F-30900 Nimes / FR | [1993/48] | Representative(s) | Gérardin, Robert Jean René, et al PROT'INNOV INTERNATIONAL SA Résidence de l'Observatoire 3A, avenue Georges Clémenceau BP 2764 51066 Reims Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/35] | Gérardin, Robert Jean René, et al PROT'INNOV INTERNATIONAL SA Résidence de l'Observatoire avenue Georges Clémenceau Boîte Postale 2764 51066 Reims Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1993/48] | Gérardin, Robert Jean René, et al PROT'INNOV INTERNATIONAL SA 18 et 18bis, rue de Bellefond BP 328-09 F-75428 Paris Cèdex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 93902307.3 | 08.12.1992 | [1993/48] | WO1992FR01159 | Priority number, date | FR19910015453 | 12.12.1991 Original published format: FR 9115453 | [1993/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9311715 | Date: | 24.06.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0571619 | Date: | 01.12.1993 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0571619 | Date: | 09.04.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/58, A61B17/70 | [1997/15] | CPC: |
A61B17/701 (EP);
A61B17/7032 (EP);
A61B17/7076 (EP);
A61B17/7082 (EP);
A61B17/7083 (EP);
A61B17/7086 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1993/48] | A61B17/60 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/48] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN ZUM GERADERICHTEN, BEFESTIGEN, ZUSAMMENDRÜCKEN UND DEHNEN DER WIRBELSÄULE | [1997/15] | English: | DEVICES FOR STRAIGHTENING, CLAMPING, COMPRESSING AND STRETCHING THE SPINE | [1997/15] | French: | DISPOSITIFS DE REDRESSEMENT, FIXATION, COMPRESSION, ELONGATION DU RACHIS | [1997/15] |
Former [1993/48] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUM GERADERICHTEN, BEFESTIGEN, ZUSAMMENDRÜCKEN UND DEHNEN DER WIRBELSÄULE | ||
Former [1993/48] | IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO PROCESSES AND DEVICES FOR STRAIGHTENING, CLAMPING, COMPRESSING AND STRETCHING THE SPINE | ||
Former [1993/48] | PERFECTIONNEMENTS AUX PROCEDES ET AUX DISPOSITIFS DE REDRESSEMENT, FIXATION, COMPRESSION, ELONGATION DU RACHIS | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.1993 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/48] | 23.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 10.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.04.1997 | DK | 09.04.1997 | GR | 09.04.1997 | NL | 09.04.1997 | PT | 09.07.1997 | SE | 09.07.1997 | LU | 08.12.1997 | CH | 31.12.1997 | LI | 31.12.1997 | [2004/38] |
Former [2000/05] | AT | 09.04.1997 | |
DK | 09.04.1997 | ||
GR | 09.04.1997 | ||
IE | 09.04.1997 | ||
NL | 09.04.1997 | ||
PT | 09.07.1997 | ||
SE | 09.07.1997 | ||
CH | 31.12.1997 | ||
LI | 31.12.1997 | ||
LU | 31.12.1997 | ||
Former [1999/16] | AT | 09.04.1997 | |
DK | 09.04.1997 | ||
IE | 09.04.1997 | ||
NL | 09.04.1997 | ||
PT | 09.07.1997 | ||
SE | 09.07.1997 | ||
CH | 31.12.1997 | ||
LI | 31.12.1997 | ||
Former [1998/50] | AT | 09.04.1997 | |
DK | 09.04.1997 | ||
NL | 09.04.1997 | ||
PT | 09.07.1997 | ||
SE | 09.07.1997 | ||
CH | 31.12.1997 | ||
LI | 31.12.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 09.04.1997 | |
DK | 09.04.1997 | ||
NL | 09.04.1997 | ||
PT | 09.07.1997 | ||
SE | 09.07.1997 | ||
Former [1998/12] | AT | 09.04.1997 | |
NL | 09.04.1997 | ||
PT | 09.07.1997 | ||
SE | 09.07.1997 | ||
Former [1998/03] | AT | 09.04.1997 | |
NL | 09.04.1997 | ||
PT | 09.07.1997 | ||
Former [1998/02] | AT | 09.04.1997 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2847014 (HARRY COHEN); | [A]DE2649042 (ULRICH MAX BERNHARD); | [A]US4347845 (MAYFIELD JACK K); | [A]GB2096465 (BOBECHKO KEVIN A); | [A]US4633862 (PETERSEN THOMAS D [US]); | [A]DE3538593 (JUNGEBLOD THOMAS DR MED); | [A]GB2198647 (JUNIPER RICHARD); | [A]DE9006694U ; | [A]EP0410309 (BIEDERMANN LUTZ [DE], et al); | [A]FR2650173 (JBS SA [FR]); | [A]WO9106261 (SURGICAL DYNAMICS INC [US]); | [A]US5020519 (HAYES S KYLE [US], et al); | [A]EP0443892 (SOFAMOR [FR]); | [A]EP0452792 (LINK WALDEMAR GMBH CO [DE]) |