EP0618966 - METHOD FOR PREPARING DOUBLE STRANDED RNA, AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.1999 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIS BIO INTERNATIONAL RN 306 91400 Saclay / FR | [1998/15] |
Former [1994/41] | For all designated states CIS BIO INTERNATIONAL RN 306 F-91400 Saclay / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIVACHE, Thierry 22, rue Félix-Esclangon F-38000 Grenoble / FR | 02 /
FOUQUE, Brigitte 3, avenue Aristide-Berges F-38170 Seyssinet / FR | 03 /
TEOULE, Robert 52, rue Thiers F-38000 Grenoble / FR | [1994/41] | Representative(s) | Orès, Irène Cabinet ORES 36,rue de St Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/41] | Ores, Irène CABINET ORES 6, Avenue de Messine F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 93902352.9 | 18.12.1992 | [1994/41] | WO1992FR01209 | Priority number, date | FR19910015710 | 18.12.1991 Original published format: FR 9115710 | [1994/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9312229 | Date: | 24.06.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0618966 | Date: | 12.10.1994 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0618966 | Date: | 08.04.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/10, C12Q1/68 | [1994/41] | CPC: |
C12P19/34 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6865 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6865, C12Q2565/518 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1994/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VORBEREITUNG VON DOPPEL STRANGIGER RNA UND SEINE ANWENDUNGEN | [1994/41] | English: | METHOD FOR PREPARING DOUBLE STRANDED RNA, AND USE THEREOF | [1994/41] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'ARN DOUBLE-BRIN, ET SES APPLICATIONS | [1994/41] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.1994 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/41] | 10.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.04.1998 | ES | 08.04.1998 | GR | 08.04.1998 | DK | 08.07.1998 | PT | 08.07.1998 | [2003/45] |
Former [2002/26] | AT | 08.04.1998 | |
ES | 08.04.1998 | ||
GR | 08.04.1998 | ||
PT | 08.07.1998 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 08.04.1998 | |
GR | 08.04.1998 | ||
PT | 08.07.1998 | ||
Former [1999/32] | AT | 08.04.1998 | |
PT | 08.07.1998 | ||
Former [1999/01] | AT | 08.04.1998 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4766072 (JENDRISAK JEROME J [US], et al); | [A]WO9014090 (HEM RES INC [US]); | [A]WO9110746 (CHIRON CORP [US]) | [A] - BIOCHEMISTRY INTERNATIONAL vol. 14, no. 6, Juin 1987, SYDNEY,AU pages 1015 - 1022 C.SADHU ET AL. 'In vitro synthesis of double stranded RNA and measurement of thermal stability: effect of base composition, formamide and ionic strength' cité dans la demande | [A] - NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH. vol. 17, 1989, ARLINGTON, VIRGINIA US page 10109 F.-U. GAST 'Multi-purpose vector for in vitro production of single- and double-stranded RNA' |