EP0572651 - NITROGENOUS MULTIACRYLIC MONOMERS, PREPARATION AND APPLICATION THEREOF IN PRODUCING NOVEL POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.1997 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.08.1997 [1997/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CRAY VALLEY SA Tour Total, 24 cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/49] | For all designated states CRAY VALLEY SA Tour Total, 24 cours Michelet F-92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PASCAULT, Jean-Pierre 40, rue du château-Gaillard F-69100 Villeurbanne / FR | 02 /
ROLLY, Florence 4, 9ème avenue Cité Berliet F-69800 Saint-Priest / FR | 03 /
TAHA, Mohamed 18, rue de la Pistoule F-34830 Clapiers / FR | 04 /
TITIER, Christelle 25, rue du Couvent F-63360 Saint-Beauzire / FR | [1993/49] | Representative(s) | Chaillot, Geneviève Cabinet Chaillot 16-20 Avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74 92703 Colombes Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/12] | Chaillot, Geneviève Cabinet CHAILLOT, 16-20, avenue de L'Agent Sarre, B.P. 74 F-92703 Colombes Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1993/49] | Dubost, Thierry Pierre Cray Valley SA, BP 22 F-60550 Verneuil en Halatte / FR | Application number, filing date | 93902371.9 | 23.12.1992 | [1993/49] | WO1992FR01229 | Priority number, date | FR19910016125 | 24.12.1991 Original published format: FR 9116125 | [1993/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9313050 | Date: | 08.07.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0572651 | Date: | 08.12.1993 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0572651 | Date: | 21.08.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07C219/08, C08F220/36, C08F212/08 | [1993/49] | CPC: |
C08G59/50 (EP,US);
C08F20/36 (EP,US);
C08F290/14 (EP,US);
C08G59/1461 (EP,US);
C08G59/56 (EP,US);
Y10S525/912 (EP);
Y10S525/922 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, NL [1995/50] |
Former [1993/49] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL | Title | German: | STICKSTOFF ENTHALTENDE MULTIACRYLIC MONOMERE, IHRE HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE ANWENDUNG ZUM HERSTELLEN VON POLYMEREN | [1996/34] | English: | NITROGENOUS MULTIACRYLIC MONOMERS, PREPARATION AND APPLICATION THEREOF IN PRODUCING NOVEL POLYMERS | [1993/49] | French: | MONOMERES MULTIACRYLIQUES AZOTES, LEUR PREPARATION ET LEUR APPLICATION A L'OBTENTION DE NOUVEAUX POLYMERES | [1993/49] |
Former [1993/49] | Stickstoff enthaltende Multiacrylic monomere, ihre Herstellung und ihre Anwendung zum Herstellen von Polymeren | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.1993 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/16] | 09.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.01.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 06.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 15.02.1994 | M01   Fee paid on   23.02.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2141897 (CIBA GEIGY AG); | [A]EP0044816 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [A]WO8606716 (INST NAT RECH CHIMIQUE [FR]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 103 (C-485)(2950) 5 Avril 1988 |