EP0623042 - PROCESS FOR REMOVING HYDROCARBONS FROM POLYMER SLURRIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.11.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2011 | Change - representative | published on 08.06.2011 [2011/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUANTUM CHEMICAL CORPORATION 11500 Northlake Drive Cincinnati, OH 45249 / US | [1994/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUNG, Chieh-Yuan, F. 7005 Plumwood Court Cincinnati, OH 45241 / US | [1994/45] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/45] | Grünecker, August, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93903461.7 | 13.01.1993 | [1994/45] | WO1993US00298 | Priority number, date | US19920820157 | 13.01.1992 Original published format: US 820157 | [1994/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9313843 | Date: | 22.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0623042 | Date: | 09.11.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.07.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B01D3/06, C08F6/10, C08F6/12 | [1994/45] | CPC: |
B01J8/005 (EP,US);
B01D3/06 (EP,US);
C08F6/003 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00006 (EP,US);
Y02P20/50 (EP,US);
Y10S159/02 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F6/003, C08L23/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1994/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON KOHLENWASSERSTOFFEN AUS POLYMERAUFSCHLÄMMUNGEN | [1994/45] | English: | PROCESS FOR REMOVING HYDROCARBONS FROM POLYMER SLURRIES | [1994/45] | French: | PROCEDE D'EXTRACTION D'HYDROCARBURES DE BOUILLIES POLYMERES | [1994/45] | File destroyed: | 12.09.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.1994 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.1994 | Search fee paid | 12.07.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 12.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/45] | 08.07.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/02] | 09.08.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB897271 (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US4184924 (HORNBAKER EDWIN D [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * claim . *; | [A]US4310973 (KING WILLIAM R) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US3007906 (LINN NORMAN F, et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US4499263 (MESSURA KATHLEEN A [US], et al); | [Y]US2949447 ; | [A]US3004019 ; | [A]US3458494 (SCOGGIN JACK S); | [A]US4532024 (HASCHKE ELLIOT M [US], et al); | [A]US4906329 (TOMINARI KENICHI [JP], et al) |