EP0623194 - Rolling bearing and method of assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/45] | BEARING SPLIT OUTER RING AND METHOD OF ASSEMBLY | ||
[1995/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.11.1996 [1996/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE TORRINGTON COMPANY 59 Field Street Torrington Connecticut 06790 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/45] | For all designated states THE TORRINGTON COMPANY 59 Field Street Torrington, Connecticut 06790 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANCIS, Thomas, M. 213 Cat Hole Road Litchfield, CT 06759 / US | 02 /
SCHICK, Gary T. P.O. Box 224, Turkeyfoot Hollow Lane Goshen, CT 06756 / US | [1994/45] | Representative(s) | Feakins, Graham Allan Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow, G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/45] | Feakins, Graham Allan RAWORTH, MOSS & COOK RAWORTH HOUSE 36 Sydenham Road Croydon, Surrey CRO 2EF / GB | Application number, filing date | 93903480.7 | 13.01.1993 | [1994/45] | WO1993US00318 | Priority number, date | US19920825233 | 24.01.1992 Original published format: US 825233 | [1994/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9315329 | Date: | 05.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0623194 | Date: | 09.11.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0623194 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F16C9/02, F16C33/60 | [1994/45] | CPC: |
B63H23/34 (KR);
F16C17/06 (KR);
F16C33/60 (EP);
F16C9/02 (EP);
F02B2075/027 (EP);
F16C19/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/45] | Title | German: | Rollenlager und Verfahren für den Zusammenbau | [1995/49] | English: | Rolling bearing and method of assembly | [1995/49] | French: | Palier à roulement et procédé d'assemblage | [1995/49] |
Former [1994/45] | Lager mit einem geteiltem Aussenring und ein Verfahren für den Zusammenbau | ||
Former [1994/45] | BEARING SPLIT OUTER RING AND METHOD OF ASSEMBLY | ||
Former [1994/45] | ANNEAU PORTEUR EXTERNE FENDU ET PROCEDE D'ASSEMBLAGE | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.1994 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/45] | 19.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US1481705 (GIMENO MANUEL G); | [X]US2371400 (MANTLE BURR W); | [X]US3007754 (CROSS GEORGE W); | [X]DE960514 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG); | [A]US1863809 (HOPKINS BENJAMIN F, et al); | [A]US3140130 (BARR VICTOR L); | [A]DE156243 ; | [A]DE698002 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG) |