EP0628195 - METHOD FOR ENCODING, DECODING AND COMPRESSION OF AUDIO-TYPE DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/50] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ENCODING, DECODING AND COMPRESSION OF AUDIO-TYPE DATA | ||
[1999/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Massachusetts Institute of Technology 77 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | For all designated states THE MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY 77 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIM, Jae, S. 21 West Chardon Road Winchester, MA 01890 / US | [1994/50] | Representative(s) | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | Popp, Eugen, Dr., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 48 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93903484.9 | 13.01.1993 | [1994/50] | WO1993US00323 | Priority number, date | US19920822247 | 17.01.1992 Original published format: US 822247 | US19920879635 | 07.05.1992 Original published format: US 879635 | [1994/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9314492 | Date: | 22.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0628195 | Date: | 14.12.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0628195 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.07.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/00, H04B1/66 | [2000/36] | CPC: |
H04B1/667 (EP,US);
G10L19/0208 (EP,US);
G10L19/0212 (EP,US);
G10L19/0204 (EP,US);
G10L2021/02163 (EP,US);
G10L25/27 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/30] | G10L5/00, H04B1/66 | ||
Former IPC [1994/50] | G10L5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT [1996/48] |
Former [1994/50] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KODIERUNG, DEKODIERUNG UND KOMPRESSION VON AUDIODATEN | [1999/44] | English: | METHOD FOR ENCODING, DECODING AND COMPRESSION OF AUDIO-TYPE DATA | [1999/44] | French: | PROCEDE DE CODAGE, DECODAGE ET COMPRESSION DE DONNEES DE TYPE AUDIO | [1999/44] |
Former [1994/50] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KODIERUNG, DEKODIERUNG UND KOMPRESSION VON AUDIODATEN | ||
Former [1994/50] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ENCODING, DECODING AND COMPRESSION OF AUDIO-TYPE DATA | ||
Former [1994/50] | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE CODAGE, DECODAGE ET COMPRESSION DE DONNEES DE TYPE AUDIO | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.1994 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.1994 | Search fee paid | 16.08.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 06.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/02] | 19.11.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 28.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 28.12.1998 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 01.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 29.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.06.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP99117212.3 / EP0961414 | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 25.10.1996 | M01   Fee paid on   06.11.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.12.2000 | DK | 27.03.2001 | [2003/45] |
Former [2001/37] | AT | 27.12.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4464782 (BERAUD JEAN-PAUL [FR], et al) [A] * column 3, line 25 - line 55 * * column 5, line 32 - line 44 ** column 6, line 38 - column 7, line 4; figure 2 *; | [A]US4899384 (CROUSE WILLIAM G [US], et al) [A] * column 4, line 26 - line 44 * * column 1, line 45 - column 3, line 24; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0457390 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] * column 5, line 22 - line 38; figure 2 * * column 6, line 25 - line 29 * * column 10, line 5 - line 12 * | International search | [YP]US5151941 (NISHIGUCHI MASAYUKI [JP], et al); | [YP]US5157760 (AKAGIRI KENZO [JP]) |