EP0629126 - A BASE FOR DENTAL PROSTHESES AND THE LIKE FOR IMPLANTATION IN BONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARZT, Erich Via della Mendola, 46/19 I-39100 Bolzano / IT | [1994/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/51] | Representative(s) | Quinterno, Giuseppe, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/51] | Quinterno, Giuseppe, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 I-10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 93904032.5 | 02.03.1993 | [1994/51] | WO1993EP00464 | Priority number, date | IT1992TO00179 | 04.03.1992 Original published format: IT TO920179 | [1994/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9317634 | Date: | 16.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0629126 | Date: | 21.12.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0629126 | Date: | 29.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61C8/00 | [1994/51] | CPC: |
A61C8/0018 (EP,US);
A61C8/0086 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/51] | Title | German: | EIN SOCKEL FÜR ZAHNPROTHESEN UND DERGLEICHEN ZUR IMPLANTATION IN KNOCHEN | [1996/22] | English: | A BASE FOR DENTAL PROSTHESES AND THE LIKE FOR IMPLANTATION IN BONE | [1994/51] | French: | BASE POUR PROTHESE DENTAIRE ET ANALOGUE DESTINEE A UNE IMPLANTATION DANS L'OS | [1994/51] |
Former [1994/51] | EIN SOCKEL FÜR ZAHNPROTHESEN UND DERGLEICHEN ZUR IMPLANATATION IN KNOCHEN | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.1994 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/51] | 06.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 29.05.1996 | IT | 29.05.1996 | [2008/05] |
Former [2000/05] | GR | 29.05.1996 | |
IT | 29.05.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 29.05.1996 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0231400 (MOZSARY PETER GABRIEL); | [A]WO8706816 (DEUTSCHER ANNELIESE HEIRESS OF [DE], et al); | [AP]WO9217127 (LUMICISI FABRIZIO [IT], et al) |