EP0628075 - ENDO-1,4-BETA-D-GLUCANASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.2002 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
PT
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2001/48] | For:GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House, Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
PT
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [1995/32] | For:GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
PT
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [1994/50] | For:GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
PT
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE SILVA, Jacqueline Pear Tree Cottage, The High Street Pavenham, Bedford MK43 7NJ / GB | 02 /
JARMAN, Carl Dudley 43 Glenfield Drive, Great Doddington Northamptonshire NN9 7TE / GB | 03 /
ARROWSMITH, David Andrew 59 Queen Street Rushden, Northamptonshire NN10 0AY / GB | 04 /
REID, John Spence Grant 6 Abbeyview Logie Road, Stirling FK9 5JZ / GB | 05 /
EDWARDS, Mary Elizabeth 6 Abbeyview Logie Road, Stirling FK9 5JZ / GB | [1994/50] | Representative(s) | Evans, Jacqueline Gail Victoria, et al Unilever plc Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | Evans, Jacqueline Gail Victoria, et al Unilever plc Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [1996/33] | Lipscombe, Martin John, et al Keith W Nash & Co, Pearl Assurance House, 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB | ||
Former [1994/50] | Butler, David John, et al Unilever PLC Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 93904273.5 | 01.03.1993 | [1994/50] | WO1993GB00424 | Priority number, date | EP19920301707 | 28.02.1992 Original published format: EP 92301707 | [1994/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9317101 | Date: | 02.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0628075 | Date: | 14.12.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0628075 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/24, C12P21/00 | [1994/50] | CPC: |
C12Y302/01073 (EP,US);
C12N9/24 (KR);
C12N15/8241 (EP,US);
C12N9/2437 (EP,US);
C12Y302/01004 (EP,US);
Y10S47/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1994/50] | Title | German: | ENDO-1,4-BETA-GLUKANASE | [1994/50] | English: | ENDO-1,4-BETA-D-GLUCANASE | [1994/50] | French: | ENDO-1,4-BETA-D-GLUCANASE | [1994/50] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.1994 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/50] | 26.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 07.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.11.2001 | FR | 28.11.2001 | GR | 28.11.2001 | IT | 28.11.2001 | DK | 28.02.2002 | PT | 28.02.2002 | SE | 28.02.2002 | GB | 01.03.2002 | ES | 02.03.2002 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/32] | AT | 28.11.2001 | |
FR | 28.11.2001 | ||
GR | 28.11.2001 | ||
DK | 28.02.2002 | ||
PT | 28.02.2002 | ||
SE | 28.02.2002 | ||
GB | 01.03.2002 | ||
ES | 02.03.2002 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 28.11.2001 | |
GR | 28.11.2001 | ||
DK | 28.02.2002 | ||
PT | 28.02.2002 | ||
SE | 28.02.2002 | ||
GB | 01.03.2002 | ||
ES | 02.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 28.11.2001 | |
GR | 28.11.2001 | ||
DK | 28.02.2002 | ||
PT | 28.02.2002 | ||
SE | 28.02.2002 | ||
GB | 01.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 28.11.2001 | |
GR | 28.11.2001 | ||
PT | 28.02.2002 | ||
SE | 28.02.2002 | ||
GB | 01.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | GR | 28.11.2001 | |
PT | 28.02.2002 | ||
SE | 28.02.2002 | ||
GB | 01.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | GR | 28.11.2001 | |
PT | 28.02.2002 | ||
SE | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | PT | 28.02.2002 | |
SE | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/26] | SE | 28.02.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP3180180 ; | [Y]EP0353191 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [A]WO9009436 (CARLSBERG AS [DK], et al) | [X] - AGRICULTURAL AND BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 53, no. 9, 1989, pages 2335-2339, Tokyo, JP, H. TEZUKA et al.: "Construction of a beta-glucanase hyperproducing Bacillus subtilis using the cloned beta-glucanase gene and a multi-copy plasmid", see abstract, figures 1-3 | [Y] - THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 261, no. 20, 15 July 1986, pages 9489-9494, Baltimore, MD, US, M. EDWARDS et al.: "Purification and properties of a novel xyloglucan-specific endo-(1-4)-beta-D-glucanase from germinated nasturtium seeds (Tropaeolum majus L.) (cited in the application) | [A] - DATABASE WPIL, week 9137, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB, AN 91-271574 [37], & JP - A - 3180180 (AJINMOTO KK) 06.08.1991, see abstract, & JP3180180 A 00000000 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS DATABASE, Ohio, US, abstract no. 115(7)67183y, C. FANUTTI et al.: "A xyloglucan-oligosaccharide-specific .alpha.-D-xylosidase or exo-oligoxyloglucan-.alpha.-xylohydrolase from germinated nasturtium (Tropaeolum majus L.) seeds. Purification, properties and its interaction with a xyloglucan-specific endo-(1.fwdarw.4)-.beta.-D-glucanase and other hydrolases during storage-xyloglucan mobilization, & Planta 1991, vol. 184, no. 1, pages 137-147 |