EP0630456 - COUPLING FOR FLANGED PIPES, PROCESS FOR CONNECTING THE FLANGES AND USE OF THE COUPLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.1998 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.06.1998 [1998/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STEELPRODUCTS OFFSHORE A/S C.O. Lundsgate 24 3003 Drammen / NO | [N/P] |
Former [1994/52] | For all designated states STEELPRODUCTS OFFSHORE A/S C.O. Lundsgate 24 N-3003 Drammen / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAHLGREN, Finn Skjaeret, Nesbygda LP N-3060 Svelvik / NO | [1994/52] | Representative(s) | Hedberg, Sten Torsten, et al Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB, Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/52] | Hedberg, Sten Torsten, et al Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB, Box 17704 S-118 93 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 93904409.5 | 22.02.1993 | [1994/52] | WO1993NO00029 | Priority number, date | NO19920000686 | 20.02.1992 Original published format: NO 920686 | [1994/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9317268 | Date: | 02.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0630456 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 02.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F16L23/032 | [1994/52] | CPC: |
F16L23/032 (EP);
E04B1/74 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/52] | Title | German: | KUPPLUNG FÜR ROHRE MIT FLANSCHEN, VERFAHREN ZUM VERBINDEN DER FLANSCHE UND GEBRAUCH DIESER KUPPLUNG | [1994/52] | English: | COUPLING FOR FLANGED PIPES, PROCESS FOR CONNECTING THE FLANGES AND USE OF THE COUPLING | [1994/52] | French: | ACCOUPLEMENT POUR TUYAUX A BRIDES, PROCEDE POUR CONNECTER LES BRIDES ET UTILISATION DE L'ACCOUPLEMENT | [1994/52] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.1994 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 24.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/52] | 29.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/25] | 14.01.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1995 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.03.1995 | 28.02.1998 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2412487 (AMLEY OLIVER B, et al); | [Y]US3214201 (FONDA ANTON F); | [Y]US4183562 (REGAN A MICHAEL [US], et al); | [A]FR1563983 ; | [A]DE3103551 ; | [A]DE2239314 (SOEHLE HARTMUT) |