EP0627904 - A HANDPIECE FOR MICROSURGERY HAVING A FLEXIBLE AND STEERABLE ASPIRATION TIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/50] | FLEXIBLE AND STEERABLE ASPIRATION TIP FOR MICROSURGERY | ||
[1997/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCON LABORATORIES, INC. 6201 South Freeway Fort Worth TX 76134-2099 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | For all designated states ALCON LABORATORIES, INC. 6201 South Freeway Fort Worth Texas 76134-2099 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEPPE, Dennis, L. 5815 East La Palma Anaheim, CA 92807 / US | [1994/50] | Representative(s) | Hanna, Peter William Derek, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | Hanna, Peter William Derek, et al Tomkins & Co., 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 93904798.1 | 03.02.1993 | [1994/50] | WO1993US00881 | Priority number, date | US19920841990 | 28.02.1992 Original published format: US 841990 | [1994/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9316668 | Date: | 02.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0627904 | Date: | 14.12.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0627904 | Date: | 26.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61F9/00, A61M1/00 | [1994/50] | CPC: |
A61M1/84 (EP,KR,US);
A61F9/00736 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2017/003 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00331 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2205/106 (EP,KR,US);
Y10S604/902 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/50] | Title | German: | HANDSTÜCK FÜR DIE MIKROCHIRURGIE MIT EINER FLEXIBLEN UND LENKBAREN ABSAUGSPITZE | [1997/48] | English: | A HANDPIECE FOR MICROSURGERY HAVING A FLEXIBLE AND STEERABLE ASPIRATION TIP | [1997/48] | French: | INSTRUMENT POUR MICROCHIRURGIE AVEC UN EMBOUT D'ASPIRATION FLEXIBLE ET ORIENTABLE | [1997/48] |
Former [1994/50] | FLEXIBLE UND LENKBARE ABSAUGSPITZE FÜR DIE MIKROCHIRURGIE | ||
Former [1994/50] | FLEXIBLE AND STEERABLE ASPIRATION TIP FOR MICROSURGERY | ||
Former [1994/50] | EMBOUT D'ASPIRATION FLEXIBLE ET ORIENTABLE POUR MICROCHIRURGIE | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.1994 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 09.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/50] | 07.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 01.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.09.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.11.1997 | BE | 26.11.1997 | DK | 26.11.1997 | ES | 26.11.1997 | GR | 26.11.1997 | NL | 26.11.1997 | IE | 03.02.1998 | LU | 03.02.1998 | PT | 26.02.1998 | SE | 26.02.1998 | [2004/38] |
Former [2003/08] | AT | 26.11.1997 | |
BE | 26.11.1997 | ||
DK | 26.11.1997 | ||
ES | 26.11.1997 | ||
GR | 26.11.1997 | ||
NL | 26.11.1997 | ||
IE | 03.02.1998 | ||
PT | 26.02.1998 | ||
SE | 26.02.1998 | ||
LU | 28.02.1998 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 26.11.1997 | |
BE | 26.11.1997 | ||
DK | 26.11.1997 | ||
ES | 26.11.1997 | ||
GR | 26.11.1997 | ||
IE | 03.02.1998 | ||
PT | 26.02.1998 | ||
SE | 26.02.1998 | ||
LU | 28.02.1998 | ||
Former [2001/01] | AT | 26.11.1997 | |
BE | 26.11.1997 | ||
DK | 26.11.1997 | ||
GR | 26.11.1997 | ||
IE | 03.02.1998 | ||
PT | 26.02.1998 | ||
SE | 26.02.1998 | ||
LU | 28.02.1998 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 26.11.1997 | |
BE | 26.11.1997 | ||
DK | 26.11.1997 | ||
GR | 26.11.1997 | ||
PT | 26.02.1998 | ||
SE | 26.02.1998 | ||
LU | 28.02.1998 | ||
Former [1998/46] | AT | 26.11.1997 | |
BE | 26.11.1997 | ||
DK | 26.11.1997 | ||
PT | 26.02.1998 | ||
SE | 26.02.1998 | ||
Former [1998/37] | AT | 26.11.1997 | |
DK | 26.11.1997 | ||
PT | 26.02.1998 | ||
SE | 26.02.1998 | ||
Former [1998/35] | AT | 26.11.1997 | |
DK | 26.11.1997 | ||
SE | 26.02.1998 | ||
Former [1998/30] | AT | 26.11.1997 | |
DK | 26.11.1997 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4577629 (MARTINEZ MIGUEL [US]); | [A]EP0316085 (COOPER CO INC [US]); | [A]DE3819372 ; | [A]US4960134 (WEBSTER JR WILTON W [US]); | [X]US5084012 (KELMAN CHARLES D [US]) |