EP0582701 - LIQUID DISPENSER ASSEMBLY WITH ADAPTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CONTICO INTERNATIONAL, INCORPORATED 1101 North Warson Road St. Louis, MO 63132 / US | [1994/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOSTER, Donald, D. 2524 Trenton Station St. Charles, MO 63303 / US | [1994/07] | Representative(s) | Copp, David Christopher Dummett Copp 25 The Square Martlesham Heath Ipswich IP5 3SL Suffolk / GB | [2008/37] |
Former [1994/07] | Copp, David Christopher 25 The Square Martlesham Heath Ipswich, Suffolk IP5 7SL / GB | Application number, filing date | 93904813.8 | 29.01.1993 | [1994/07] | WO1993US00899 | Priority number, date | US19920829759 | 31.01.1992 Original published format: US 829759 | US19920984876 | 02.12.1992 Original published format: US 984876 | [1994/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9314983 | Date: | 05.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0582701 | Date: | 16.02.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0582701 | Date: | 25.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.08.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B65D23/10, B67D5/40, B05B9/043 | [1997/26] | CPC: |
B05B9/0426 (EP,US);
B05B11/1045 (EP,US);
B05B11/001 (EP,US);
B05B11/1011 (EP,US);
B05B15/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/07] | B65D23/10, B67D5/40 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/07] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKEITSSPENDEREINRICHTUNG MIT ADAPTER | [1994/07] | English: | LIQUID DISPENSER ASSEMBLY WITH ADAPTOR | [1994/07] | French: | ENSEMBLE DISTRIBUTEUR DE LIQUIDE POURVU D'UN ADAPTATEUR | [1994/07] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.1993 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.1993 | Search fee paid | 14.10.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.1993 | Examination requested [1994/07] | 23.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1997 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   01.04.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE7927316U (GARDENA KRESS + KASTNER GMBH) [A] 3 * page 6, paragraph L; figure - *; | [A]EP0208390 (ECONOMICS LAB [US]) [A] 7* abstract *; | [A]GB2210813 (CHOWART LIMITED [GB]) [A] 2 * page 5, line 22 - page 6, line 1; figure 4 * | International search | [Y]US2805001 (BIEDERMAN JOSEPH B); | [Y]US3061202 (TYLER TRACY B); | [XY]US3078471 (KNIBB LEROY H); | [XY]US3927797 (FLIDER FRANK S); | [X]US4365751 (SAITO TADAO, et al); | [Y]US4541529 (HESTEHAVE BORGE [US], et al); | [X]US4925040 (WANG PAUL S [US]); | [A]US5154324 (STRATFORD MICHAEL G [GB]) |