EP0584317 - Fluid path having a frangible seal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/09] | RELIABLE BREAKABLE CLOSURE MECHANISM | ||
[1996/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.1997 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.04.1997 [1997/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baxter International Inc. One Baxter Parkway Deerfield, Illinois 60015 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/10] | For all designated states BAXTER INTERNATIONAL INC. One Baxter Parkway - 2E Deerfield, Illinois 60015 / US | ||
Former [1994/09] | For all designated states BAXTER TRAVENOL LABORATORIES, INC. One Baxter Parkway Deerfield, IL 60015 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATHIAS, Jean-Marie 46, av. du Tonnelier B-1428 Lillois / BE | 02 /
BERNES, Jean-Claude 7, rue de la Vallée B-4317 Faimes / BE | 03 /
LAVEZZO, Ermenegildo 33, rue Vandervelde B-6182 Souvret / BE | 04 /
DEBRAUWERE, Jack Debusscherstraat 38 B-1500 Halle / BE | [1994/09] | Representative(s) | MacGregor, Gordon Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/09] | MacGregor, Gordon ERIC POTTER CLARKSON St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham, NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 93905007.6 | 09.02.1993 | [1994/09] | WO1993US01170 | Priority number, date | US19920849267 | 11.03.1992 Original published format: US 849267 | [1994/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9317734 | Date: | 16.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0584317 | Date: | 02.03.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0584317 | Date: | 10.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.09.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61J1/00, A61M39/00 | [1994/22] | CPC: |
A61M39/221 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/09] | A61M5/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/09] | Title | German: | Durchfluss-stück mit brechbarem Propfen | [1996/15] | English: | Fluid path having a frangible seal | [1996/15] | French: | Tube avec un diaphragme rupturable | [1996/15] |
Former [1994/09] | SAUGFAEHIGER ARTIKEL MIT ELASTISCHEM TAILLENBUND UND ERHOEHTER SAUGFAEHIGKEIT | ||
Former [1994/09] | RELIABLE BREAKABLE CLOSURE MECHANISM | ||
Former [1994/09] | MECANISME DE FERMETURE CASSABLE FIABLE | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.1993 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.1993 | Search fee paid | 29.10.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.1993 | Examination requested [1994/09] | 03.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]DE4116474 (SPANG & BRANDS GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1-7 * column 5, line 30 - line 40; figure -; claims 1,3,4 * | International search | [Y]US4340049 (MUNSCH JOHN M); | [A]US4479989 (MAHAL MOHAN S [US]); | [AE]US5188629 (SHIMODA KEITARO [JP]); | [Y]WO9111152 (BAXTER INT [US]) |