EP0625884 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE TEMPERATURE OF A CATHETER-MOUNTED HEATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 16.02.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2001 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 04.04.2001 [2001/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baxter International Inc. One Baxter Parkway Deerfield, IL 60015-4633 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/39] | For all designated states BAXTER INTERNATIONAL INC. One Baxter Parkway Deerfield, IL 60015-4633 / US | ||
Former [1994/48] | For all designated states INTERFLO MEDICAL, INC. 1101 Resource Drive, Suite 121 Plano, TX 75074 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCKOWN, Russell, C. 1104 Pittsburg Landing Richardson, TX 75080 / US | 02 /
QUINN, Michael, D. 3121 Amesbury Drive Plano, TX 75093 / US | 03 /
YELDERMAN, Mark, L. 5205 Terrace View Plano, TX 75093 / US | [1994/48] | Representative(s) | MacGregor, Gordon, et al Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/48] | MacGregor, Gordon, et al ERIC POTTER CLARKSON St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham, NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 93905011.8 | 09.02.1993 | [1994/48] | WO1993US01199 | Priority number, date | US19920833013 | 10.02.1992 Original published format: US 833013 | [1994/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9315654 | Date: | 19.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0625884 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0625884 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/027, G05D23/00, A61B5/028 | [1998/02] | CPC: |
A61B5/028 (EP);
A61B5/6855 (EP);
A61B5/6857 (EP);
G05D23/2401 (EP);
A61B2018/00166 (EP);
A61B2018/00666 (EP);
A61B2018/00678 (EP);
A61B2018/00708 (EP);
A61B2018/00791 (EP);
A61B2018/00797 (EP);
A61B2018/00815 (EP);
A61B2018/00821 (EP);
A61B2562/08 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1994/48] | A61B5/027, G05D23/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/48] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR TEMPERATURREGELUNG EINES IN EINEM KATHETER ANGEBRACHTEN HEIZELEMENTES | [1994/48] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE TEMPERATURE OF A CATHETER-MOUNTED HEATER | [1994/48] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE REGULATION DE TEMPERATURE D'UN ELEMENT CHAUFFANT MONTE SUR UN CATHETER | [1994/48] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.1994 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 01.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/48] | 10.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 24.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.10.1998
WITHDRAWN ABBOTT LABORATORIES 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park IL 60064 / US Opponent's representative Josif, Albert Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.10.1998
WITHDRAWN Abbott Laboratories 100 Abbott Park Road, Abbott Park Illinois 60064-6050 / US Opponent's representative Josif, Albert Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | 12.11.1998 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.05.1999 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 03.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 03.11.2000 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 13.11.2000 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2001/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9103208 ; | [Y]US4941475 ; | [A]US4576182 ; | [A]US5047025 | Examination | US4832504 | US5007423 |