EP0627918 - NEW USE OF OMEGA-3-FATTY ACIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 15.12.2004 [2004/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fresenius Kabi AB Rapsgatan 7 751 74 Uppsala / SE | [2001/24] |
Former [1998/52] | For all designated states Pharmacia & Upjohn Aktiebolag 112 87 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1995/32] | For all designated states Kabi Pharmacia AB Rapsgatan 7 S-751 82 Uppsala / SE | ||
Former [1994/50] | For all designated states KABI PHARMACIA AB S-751 82 Uppsala / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EGBERG, Nils Hägerstigen 9 S-181 40 Lidingö / SE | 02 /
LARSSON-BACKSTRÖM, Carin Lappkärsvägen 43 S-104 05 Stockholm / SE | 03 /
JAKOBSSON, Jan Falks Väg 13 S-184 64 Djursholm / SE | 04 /
LUNDH, Rolf Mickelsbergsvägen 322 S-141 71 Huddinge / SE | [1994/50] | Representative(s) | Mai, Oppermann & Partner i.L. Patentanwälte Postfach 3929 65029 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/13] | Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner GbR Patentanwälte, Postfach 3929 65029 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 93905710.5 | 23.02.1993 | [1994/50] | WO1993SE00146 | Priority number, date | SE19920000541 | 24.02.1992 Original published format: SE 9200541 | [1994/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9316691 | Date: | 02.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0627918 | Date: | 14.12.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0627918 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 02.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/20, A61K31/23 | [1994/50] | CPC: |
A61K31/23 (EP,US);
A61K31/20 (EP,US);
A61K31/22 (EP,US);
A61K35/60 (EP,US);
A61K36/48 (EP,US);
A61K36/55 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K36/48, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K36/55, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/50] | Title | German: | NEUE VERWENDUNG VON OMEGA-3-FETTSÄUREN | [1994/50] | English: | NEW USE OF OMEGA-3-FATTY ACIDS | [1994/50] | French: | NOUVELLE UTILISATION POUR LES ACIDES GRAS OMEGA 3 | [1994/50] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.1994 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 23.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/51] | 02.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | PT | 31.01.2002 | GR | 01.02.2002 | LU | 23.02.2002 | [2004/51] |
Former [2004/39] | PT | 31.01.2002 | |
LU | 23.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | PT | 31.01.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP59078118 ; | [A]US4678808 (WARD MICHAEL V [US], et al); | [A]WO8801861 (BAXTER TRAVENOL LAB [US]); | [A]DE3719097 (FRATZER UWE); | [A]GB2221843 (NORSK HYDRO AS [NO]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 8, No. 184, C-239; & JP,A,59 078 118 (NORIKO IGARASHI et al.), 4 May 1984 (04.05.84)., & JP59078118 A 19840504 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 111, No. 3, 17 July 1989 (17.07.89), (Columbus, Ohio, USA), LIU YUJUN et al.: "Effect of Fish Oil Rich in Eicosapentaenoic and Docosahexaenoic Acids on Platelet Aggregation, Coagulation Time, and Tissue Fatty Acid Compositions in Rabbits", the Abstract No. 22542r, Yingyang Xuebao 1988, |