EP0626905 - CHEMICALLY RESISTANT DIAPHRAGM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.1997 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.06.1997 [1997/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W.L. GORE & ASSOCIATES, INC. 551 Paper Mill Road, P.O. Box 9206 Newark Delaware 19714-9206 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/49] | For all designated states W.L. GORE & ASSOCIATES, INC. 551 Paper Mill Road, P.O. Box 9206 Newark, Delaware 19714-9206 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KNOX, John, B. 8 Hill Spring Road Chadsford, PA 19317 / US | 02 /
CONNELLY, John, M. 61 Cree Terrace Rising Sun, MD 21911 / US | [1994/49] | Representative(s) | McCallum, William Potter, et al Marks & Clerk 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/49] | McCallum, William Potter, et al Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 93905830.1 | 09.02.1993 | [1994/49] | WO1993US01140 | Priority number, date | US19920837717 | 19.02.1992 Original published format: US 837717 | [1994/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9316875 | Date: | 02.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0626905 | Date: | 07.12.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0626905 | Date: | 26.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/04, B32B27/12, F04B43/02, B01D71/36 | [1994/49] | CPC: |
B29C70/086 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (US);
B32B27/12 (EP,US);
B32B27/304 (US);
B32B27/32 (US);
B32B27/322 (US);
B32B7/12 (US);
F16J3/02 (EP,US);
B29K2021/00 (EP,US);
B29K2227/18 (EP,US);
B29L2031/755 (EP,US);
B32B2260/021 (US);
B32B2260/046 (US);
B32B2262/0253 (US);
B32B2274/00 (US);
B32B2327/06 (US);
B32B2327/18 (US);
Y10T428/2457 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3154 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31544 (EP,US);
Y10T442/608 (EP,US);
Y10T442/677 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1994/49] | Title | German: | CHEMISCH RESISTENTES DIAPHRAGMA | [1994/49] | English: | CHEMICALLY RESISTANT DIAPHRAGM | [1994/49] | French: | DIAPHRAGME A RESISTANCE CHIMIQUE | [1994/49] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.1994 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/49] | 26.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 26.09.1996 | [1997/17] | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0302596 (GORE & ASS [US]); | [A]EP0391660 (GORE & ASS [US]) | [A] - DERWENT ACCESSION NO. 80-594 50C, Questel Tele- systems (WPIL) DERWENT PUBLICATIONS LTD., London | Examination | - DERWENT ACCESSION NO. 80-594 50C, Questel Telesystems (WPIL) DERWENT PUBLICATIONS LTD., London, abstract, JP,A, 55-090347 |