EP0629247 - KNIT FABRIC WITH ELASTIC COMBINATION YARN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.1999 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.11.1999 [1999/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/51] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRUNFELD, Albert, John 2151 Elder Drive Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | [1994/51] | Representative(s) | Abitz, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner, Poschingerstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/51] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner, Poschingerstrasse 6 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93906116.4 | 26.02.1993 | [1994/51] | WO1993US01526 | Priority number, date | US19920841808 | 26.02.1992 Original published format: US 841808 | [1994/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9317162 | Date: | 02.09.1993 | [1993/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0629247 | Date: | 21.12.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0629247 | Date: | 02.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | D04B1/18 | [1994/51] | CPC: |
D04B1/18 (EP,US);
Y10T442/413 (EP,US);
Y10T442/45 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/51] | Title | German: | GESTRICK AUS ELASTISCHEM KOMBINATIONSGARN | [1994/51] | English: | KNIT FABRIC WITH ELASTIC COMBINATION YARN | [1994/51] | French: | TRICOT A FIL ELASTIQUE COMBINE | [1994/51] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.1994 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/51] | 18.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2224755 (MILLER HARNESS CO INC [US]) [A] 1,2,5 * page 4, line 20 - page 6, line 9; figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR2653789 (LEBORGNE SA ETS J [FR]) [A] 1,5 * page 2, line 3 - page 3, line 18; figure 1 *; | [A]FR1464865 (RHODIACETA); | [DA]US5050406 (STRAUSS ISIDORE [US], et al); | [DA]US3392552 (MULLER RIENK J, et al); | [DA]US3940917 (STRACHAN DONALD RITTLER); | [A] - KLAUS KUNDE, "Elastomerverarbeitung auf Rundstrickmaschinen.", MELLIAND TEXTILBERICHTE, HEIDELBERG, (199210), vol. 73, no. 10, pages 812 - 815, XP000310466 |