EP0587840 - BIOARTIFICIAL ENDOCRINE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2000 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.11.2000 [2000/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENCELLE, INC. 545 Hanna Building Cleveland, OH 44115 / US | [1994/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
USALA, Anton-Lewis 237 Buckingham Drive Winterville, NC 28590 / US | [1994/12] | Representative(s) | Cronin, Brian Harold John CRONIN Intellectual Property Chemin de Précossy 31 1260 Nyon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1994/12] | Cronin, Brian Harold John Moinas, Kiehl & Cronin 42 rue Plantamour CH-1201 Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 93906163.6 | 23.02.1993 | [1994/12] | WO1993US01583 | Priority number, date | US19920841973 | 24.02.1992 Original published format: US 841973 | [1994/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9316685 | Date: | 02.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0587840 | Date: | 23.03.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0587840 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.09.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/14, A61F2/06, A61K9/00 | [1995/21] | CPC: |
A61K9/0024 (EP,US);
A61F2/022 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/12] | A61K9/14, A61F2/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/26] |
Former [1994/12] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | KÜNSTLICHE ENDOKRINE VORRICHTUNG | [1994/18] | English: | BIOARTIFICIAL ENDOCRINE DEVICE | [1994/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF ENDOCRINIEN BIO-ARTIFICIEL | [1994/12] |
Former [1994/12] | BIOARTIFIZIELLE ENDOKRINE VORRICHTUNG | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.1993 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.1993 | Search fee paid | 22.11.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/18] | 27.04.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 02.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.1998 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 07.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1995 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.06.1995 | 29.02.1996 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   04.04.1996 | 28.02.1999 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   26.05.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4861658 (GRIFFIN DONALD L [US], et al) | International search | [Y]BE882476 (DAMON CORP); | [Y]EP0147939 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON [US]) |